Bonham v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of

Plaintiff: Angelina Bonham
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Case Number: 6:2018cv01285
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: Kansas District Court
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2018 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Angelina Bonham upon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served Atty General 10/29/18)(Overton, Kathleen)
November 20, 2018 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Angelina Bonham upon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served Office of Regional Counsel 10/25/18)(Overton, Kathleen)
November 20, 2018 5 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified mail on 10/24/2018 Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 10/24/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. Summons served on United States Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served US Atty 10/24/18)(Overton, Kathleen)
November 14, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge John W Lungstrum for all further proceedings. District Judge Holly L. Teeter no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 11/14/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(md)
October 19, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to Attorney for service). (mam)
October 12, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aa)
October 11, 2018 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Angelina Bonham - trial to be held in Wichita. (Overton, Kathleen)
October 11, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Angelina Bonham. (Overton, Kathleen)
October 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4605130.), filed by Angelina Bonham.(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonham v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina Bonham
Represented By: Kathleen E. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?