Jones v. Blattner Energy, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Steven Jones
Defendant: blattner energy, inc. and Saul Hurtado
Case Number: 6:2018cv01290
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Kansas District Court
0 Judge: Kenneth G Gale
1 Judge: J Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2018 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Steven Jones upon Blattner Energy, Inc. served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018 (Mose, Paul)
November 26, 2018 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Complaint on Defendant Blattner Energy, Inc. by Steven Jones (Mose, Paul)
November 6, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Blattner Energy, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
October 25, 2018 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ron D. Martinek on behalf of Saul Hurtado. (Martinek, Ron)
October 25, 2018 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Saul Hurtado.(Martinek, Ron)
October 23, 2018 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- PERSONAL SERVICE by Steven Jones upon Saul Hurtado served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Mose, Paul) Modified on 11/2/2018 to add the service and answer dates (originally filed under the wrong event type). (mam)
October 18, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Saul Hurtado. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
October 17, 2018 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Steven Jones - trial to be held in Wichita. (Mose, Paul)
October 15, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
October 15, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge J. Thomas Marten and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
October 12, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Steven Jones. (Mose, Paul)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4607294), filed by Steven Jones. (Mose, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Blattner Energy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: blattner energy, inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saul Hurtado
Represented By: Ron D. Martinek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Jones
Represented By: Paul H. Mose
Represented By: David J. Rebein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?