Laber v. United States Department of Defense
Plaintiff: Stan Laber
Defendant: United States Department of Defense
Case Number: 6:2018cv01351
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: John W Broomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 3/19/2019 for Defendant United States Department of Defense to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 1/22/2019. (sz)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE by Stan Laber re #3 , #4 , #5 . (jk)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed -- United States Attorney General served by Certified Mail on 1/3/2019. (jk)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed -- Office of the Regional Counsel served by Certified Mail on 1/3/2019. (jk)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed -- U.S. attorney served by Certified Mail on 1/4/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (jk)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff Stan Laber is a registered pro se participant who will receive electronic notification in this case. (mg)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Stan Laber. (jk)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Stan Laber. (jk)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $400, receipt number W4631017152. (jk)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Defense, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to pro se Plaintiff by email for service). Notice mailed to pro se Plaintiff Stan Laber at 321 S. Main Ave. Albany, NY 12209. (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laber v. United States Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stan Laber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Defense
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?