Taylor et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Christina Taylor and Donald Taylor
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and LM Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 6:2019cv01030
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. Plaintiff's objection to Defendants' designation of place of trial (Doc. 10) is sustained. Defendants designated the place of trial as Kansas City although this action was removed from Butler County, Kansas (Doc. 3). Plaintiff objected to the designation on the basis that this case concerns a fire to an insured premises only 30 miles from Wichita. Defendants have not responded to Plaintiff's objection and the time for doing so has passed. Therefore, the objection is sustained. D. Kan. Rule 7.4(b). Wichita is designated as the place of trial. Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 04/12/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jmr)
April 9, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Plaintiffs by Christina Taylor, Donald Taylor (McMaster, Kevin)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/28/2019 at 10:30 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. All counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/8/19. (ss)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 4/8/2019. (FTR: 9:00.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
March 26, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Moothart, Bruce)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTION(S) to #3 Designation of Place of Trial by Christina Taylor, Donald Taylor. (McMaster, Kevin)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Christina Taylor, Donald Taylor - trial to be held in Wichita. (McMaster, Kevin)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2019 at 9:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 3/26/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 3/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/25/19. (ss)
February 12, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Moothart, Bruce)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by LM Insurance Corporation.(Moothart, Bruce)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Liberty Mutual Group Inc. as corporate parent (Moothart, Bruce)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LM Insurance Corporation identifying Liberty Mutual Insurance Company as corporate parent (Moothart, Bruce)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Moothart, Bruce)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Moothart, Bruce)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Butler County, Kansas, case number 2019-CV-000015 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4711148.), filed by LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing)(Moothart, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce A. Moothart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Bruce A. Moothart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Taylor
Represented By: Kevin M. McMaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Taylor
Represented By: Kevin M. McMaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?