Conner v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Conner
Defendant: Scotta D. Hamilton, Reed C. O'Conner and United States of America
Case Number: 6:2019cv01034
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT. Plaintiff Ronald Conner's Complaint #1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and this case is closed. Signed by deputy clerk on 3/22/2019. Mailed to pro se party Ronald Conner at 1057 N. Old Manor Rd Wichita, Kansas 67208 by regular mail. (sz)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER adopting #5 Report and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/22/2019. Mailed to pro se party Ronald Conner at 1057 N. Old Manor Rd Wichita, Kansas 67208 by regular mail. (sz)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Ronald Conner, addressed to Ronald Conner. (sz)
February 21, 2019 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Ronald Conner mailed to Ronald Conner, 1057 N. Old Manor, Wichita, KS 67208 on 2/21/2019 by certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number 70123050000111904396. (aw)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Dismissal re #1 Complaint filed by Ronald Conner. This document also serves as the ORDER granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The document is included twice in the Court's docketing system for administrative/tracking purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 2/20/19. Mailed to pro se party Ronald Conner by certified mail. (df)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This Order also serves as the Report & Recommendation of Dismissal to the District Court. The document is included twice in the Court's docketing system for administrative/tracking purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 2/20/19. Mailed to pro se party Ronald Conner by certified mail. (df)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ronald Conner. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Financial Status) NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (jk)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Ronald Conner. (jk)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Ronald Conner. (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conner v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scotta D. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed C. O'Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?