Taylor et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Christina Taylor and Donald Taylor
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and LM Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 6:2019cv01035
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO DISMISS granting #6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/1/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sz)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #5 Order to Show Cause, by Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation(Lyeshchenko, Darya)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Lyeshchenko, Darya)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. No later than February 28, 2019, Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and LM Insurance Corporation shall show good cause in writing to U.S. District Judge Eric F. Melgren why the court should not dismiss Case No. 19-cv-1035-EFM-TJJ in light of the filing of Case No. 19-cv-1030-JWB-JPO, or in the alternative, why Case No. 19-cv-1035-EFM-TJJ and Case No. 19-cv-1030-JWB-JPO should not be consolidated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/20/2019. (ts)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mark B. Schaffer on behalf of LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Schaffer, Mark)
February 15, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation - trial to be held in Wichita. (Lyeshchenko, Darya) Modified on 2/15/2019 to correct filers. (mam)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation of Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lyeshchenko, Darya) Modified on 2/15/2019 to correct filers. (mam)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Butler County, Kansas District Court, case number 2019-CV-000015. Trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4715499.), filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Lyeshchenko, Darya) Modified on 2/15/2019 to change the designation from KC to Wichita. (mam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Darya Vladimirovna Lyeshchenko
Represented By: Mark B. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Darya Vladimirovna Lyeshchenko
Represented By: Mark B. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Taylor
Represented By: Kevin M. McMaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Taylor
Represented By: Kevin M. McMaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?