KCI Auto Auction, Inc. v. Anderson, et al.
Plaintiff: KCI Auto Auction, Inc.
Defendant: Tom Ephrem, Quality Used Cars, LLC, Barry Ristick, David Ephrem, Danny Ephrem and Angelo Jefferson
Petitioner: Smith & Company, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01040
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: J Thomas Marten
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 second unopposed motion for extension of time. Non-party Smith & Company, Inc. shall file any response or partial motion to quash the subpoena served upon it by May 13, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 04/22/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jc)
April 22, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for extension of time by Movant Smith & Company, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Weber, J.)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 unopposed motion for extension of time. Non-party Smith & Company, Inc. shall file any response or partial motion to quash the subpoena served upon it by April 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 04/15/19. (jc)
April 15, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for extension of time by Movant Smith and Company, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Weber, J.)
April 15, 2019 Filing 22 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by J. Joseph Weber on behalf of Smith and Company, Inc. (Weber, J.)
April 5, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Judgment Creditor KCI Auto Auction, Inc.'s First Sets of Post-Judgment Interrogatories and First Sets of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Judgment Debtors Angelo Jefferson, Barry Ristick, Danny Ephrem, David Ephrem, Tom Ephrem and Quality Used Cars, LLC by KCI Auto Auction, Inc. (Stewart, Shawn)
April 5, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Sets of Post-Judgment Interrogatories Directed to Judgment Debtors and First Sets of Post-Judgment Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Judgment Debtors by KCI Auto Auction, Inc.. (Stewart, Shawn)
March 21, 2019 Filing 19 WRIT OF GENERAL EXECUTION issued as to Tom Ephrem. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/21/2019. (mam)
March 21, 2019 Filing 18 WRIT OF GENERAL EXECUTION issued as to Quality Used Cars, LLC. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/21/2019. (mam)
March 21, 2019 Filing 17 WRIT OF GENERAL EXECUTION issued as to David Ephrem. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/21/2019. (mam)
March 21, 2019 Filing 16 WRIT OF GENERAL EXECUTION issued as to Danny Ephrem. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/21/2019. (mam)
March 21, 2019 Filing 15 WRIT OF GENERAL EXECUTION issued as to Barry Ristick. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/21/2019. (mam)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 WRIT OF GENERAL EXECUTION issued as to Angelo Jefferson. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/21/2019. (mam)
March 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENA by KCI Auto Auction, Inc. Subpoena to be issued to: SMITH & COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Stewart, Shawn)
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENA by KCI Auto Auction, Inc. Subpoena to be issued to: Credit King Auto Sales, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Stewart, Shawn)
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION FOR WRIT of General Execution in re: Tom Ephrem by KCI Auto Auction, Inc.. (Stewart, Shawn)
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION FOR WRIT of General Execution in re: Quality Used Cars, LLC by KCI Auto Auction, Inc.. (Stewart, Shawn)
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION FOR WRIT of General Execution in re: David Ephrem by KCI Auto Auction, Inc.. (Stewart, Shawn)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION FOR WRIT of General Execution in re: Danny Ephrem by KCI Auto Auction, Inc.. (Stewart, Shawn)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION FOR WRIT of General Execution in re: Barry Ristick by KCI Auto Auction, Inc.. (Stewart, Shawn)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION FOR WRIT of General Execution in re: Angelo Jefferson by KCI Auto Auction, Inc.. (Stewart, Shawn)
February 25, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge J. Thomas Marten and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
February 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SERVICE by KCI Auto Auction, Inc. of Registration of Foreign Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stewart, Shawn)
February 23, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Shawn E. Stewart by KCI Auto Auction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stewart, Shawn)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Filing of Registration of Foreign Judgment by KCI Auto Auction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stewart, Shawn)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Shawn E. Stewart by KCI Auto Auction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stewart, Shawn)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - Registration of Foreign Judgment filed by Shawn E. Stewart on behalf of KCI Auto Auction, Inc.. Filing fee $47, receipt number AKSDC-4721365., filed by on behalf of KCI Auto Auction, Inc..(Stewart, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KCI Auto Auction, Inc. v. Anderson, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Ephrem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Used Cars, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Ristick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ephrem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Ephrem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelo Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KCI Auto Auction, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn E. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Smith & Company, Inc.
Represented By: J. Joseph Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?