Shirkmere Properties, LLC v. Chubb Custom Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Shirkmere Properties, LLC
Defendant: Chubb Custom Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01067
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Shirkmere Properties, LLC of Discovery (Hazlewood, N.)
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT MEDIATION NOTICE - Mediation to be held August 15, 2019 by Shirkmere Properties, LLC (Elliott, Nathan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS by John J. Gates (Gates, John)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEDIATION MINUTE ORDER - The undersigned magistrate judge has reviewed the joint settlement report submitted by counsel in accordance with the Scheduling Order (ECF No. 14). The September 13, 2019 mediation deadline in the Scheduling Order remains in effect. In addition, by July 10, 2019, the parties shall jointly file a notice confirming whom they've retained to serve as mediator, along with the firmly scheduled date, time, and place of mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/17/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 5/15/2019. Mediation Notice FILED or Confidential Settlement Report EMAILED to Magistrate Judge by 6/14/2019. Mediation deadline 9/13/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/16/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 03:00 PM by telephone - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 4901386 before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Dispositive motion deadline 1/13/2020. The jury trial is estimated to take 5 days and will be tried before District Judge Eric F. Melgren in Wichita, KS. The jury trial will be set at the pretrial conference on 12/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/15/2019. (ck)
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/13/2019. Scheduling Order to follow. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
May 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Shirkmere Properties, LLC of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Hazlewood, N.)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosure by Chubb Custom Insurance Company (Gates, John)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew S. Ponzi and granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew P. Fortin for Chubb Custom Insurance Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/; Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 03/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn)
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice re #8 MOTION for attorney Matthew P. Fortin to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4758593.) by Defendant Chubb Custom Insurance Company(Gates, John)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Matthew P. Fortin to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4758593.) by Defendant Chubb Custom Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Gates, John)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice re #6 MOTION for attorney Matthew S. Ponzi to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4758567.) by Defendant Chubb Custom Insurance Company(Gates, John)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Matthew S. Ponzi to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4758567.) by Defendant Chubb Custom Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Gates, John)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTIES WHO WILL PARTICIPATE MUST DIAL 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 5/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 3/28/2019. (ts)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Chubb Custom Insurance Company.(Gates, John)
March 21, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Chubb Custom Insurance Company - trial to be held in Wichita. (Gates, John)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Chubb Custom Insurance Company. (Gates, John)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sedgwick County, case number 2019-cv-286 Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4749498.), filed by Chubb Custom Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gates, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shirkmere Properties, LLC v. Chubb Custom Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirkmere Properties, LLC
Represented By: Nathan Elliott
Represented By: Jacob S. Graybill
Represented By: N. Russell Hazlewood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Custom Insurance Company
Represented By: John J. Gates
Represented By: Matthew P. Fortin
Represented By: Matthew S. Ponzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?