Herbert v. Hall et al

Plaintiff: Corey Herbert
Defendant: Wichita State University Tech and James Hall
Case Number: 6:2019cv01106
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: John W Broomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER taking under advisement #11 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is granted 14 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint curing the defects noted above. Failure to file an amended complaint within the 14-day period will result in dismissal of the action without further notice. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 7/3/2019. Mailed to pro se party Corey Herbert at 910 Harding St. Wichita, KS 67208 by regular mail. (mam)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants James Hall, Wichita State University Tech re: #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Rupe, Alan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Jessica L. Skladzien as to James Hall, Wichita State University Tech (Skladzien, Jessica)
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants James Hall, Wichita State University Tech (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Declaration of Justin Pfeifer)(Rupe, Alan)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants James Hall, Wichita State University Tech (Rupe, Alan)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 5/23/2019 for Defendants James Hall, Wichita State University Tech to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 5/07/2019. Mailed to pro se party Corey Herbert at 910 Harding St, Wichita, KS 67208 by regular mail. (jk)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 5/3/19. Mailed to pro se party Corey Herbert, 910 Harding St, Wichita, KS 67208 by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(rel)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED upon James Hall (Dean). Served on 4/5/2019 by residential service. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN SEDGWICK COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 4/8/19) (sz)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED upon Wichita State University Tech (President). Served on 4/5/2019 by residential service. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN SEDGWICK COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 4/8/19) (sz)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORDS from Sedgwick County District Court. (Rupe, Alan)
May 2, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Notice mailed to pro se party Corey Herbert at 910 Harding St. Wichita, KS 67208. (mam)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SERVICE by James Hall, Wichita State University Tech of Notice of Removal (Rupe, Alan)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Alan L. Rupe on behalf of James Hall, Wichita State University Tech (Rupe, Alan)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants James Hall, Wichita State University Tech - trial to be held in Wichita. (Rupe, Alan)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants James Hall, Wichita State University Tech. (Rupe, Alan)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sedgwick County District Court, case number 2019-CV-000733 Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4795286.), filed by James Hall, Wichita State University Tech. (Attachments: #1 State Court Records)(Rupe, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herbert v. Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wichita State University Tech
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Represented By: Jessica L. Skladzien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hall
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Represented By: Jessica L. Skladzien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Herbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?