United States of America v. Hurst et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Abby L. Hurst and Daniel F. Hurst
Case Number: 6:2019cv01120
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6502
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America by Abby L. Hurst, Daniel F. Hurst.(Andrusak, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co. as corporate parent . (Masoner, Michelle)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Julie Peters for Abby L. Hurst, Julie Peters for Daniel F. Hurst pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 06/20/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ctv)
June 20, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Julie Peters re #15 MOTION for attorney Julie Peters to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4841945.) by Defendants Abby L. Hurst, Daniel F. Hurst (Attachments: #1 Exhibit OK Certificate of Good Standing, #2 ECF Registration Form Registration form)(Andrusak, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Regarding: #16 Affidavit of Julie Peters. D. Kan. Rule 85.5.4(a)(4) requires motions to appear pro hac vice to be "accompanied by an affidavit on the form prescribed by court rule." Ms. Peters has not used the correct form affidavit. By June 21, 2019, Defendants Daniel L. Hurst and Abby L. Hurst are directed to file a supplemental affidavit executed by Ms. Peters in the form prescribed by this district, which can be found at: http://ksd.uscourts.gov/index.php/attorney-resources-practice/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/20/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(bh)
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Julie Peters re #15 MOTION for attorney Julie Peters to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4841945.) by Defendants Abby L. Hurst, Daniel F. Hurst(Andrusak, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Julie Peters to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4841945.) by Defendants Abby L. Hurst, Daniel F. Hurst (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Andrusak, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2019: #1 ECF Form) (gw).
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s ANSWER to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Masoner, Michelle)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2019 at 11:00 AM in Topeka Courtroom 470 (ADM) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 7/16/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 7/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/13/2019. (ht)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Agreed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. shall have until June 17, 2019 to file its answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/7/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ks)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Easley, William)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by William Easley on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Easley, William)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michelle M. Masoner on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Masoner, Michelle)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Daniel F. Hurst and Abby L. Hurst shall have until June 28, 2019 to file their answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/7/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ks)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Abby L. Hurst, Daniel F. Hurst (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Andrusak, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael R. Andrusak on behalf of Abby L. Hurst, Daniel F. Hurst. (Andrusak, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by United States of America upon JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019 (Wiesner, Jared)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by United States of America upon Abby L. Hurst served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019 (Wiesner, Jared)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by United States of America upon Daniel F. Hurst served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019 (Wiesner, Jared)
May 10, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Abby L. Hurst, Daniel F. Hurst, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
May 10, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff United States of America - trial to be held in Wichita. (Wiesner, Jared)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wiesner, Jared)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hurst et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michelle M. Masoner
Represented By: William Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abby L. Hurst
Represented By: Michael R. Andrusak
Represented By: Cody Branham
Represented By: Julie Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel F. Hurst
Represented By: Michael R. Andrusak
Represented By: Cody Branham
Represented By: Julie Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jared S. Wiesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?