ProEquities, Inc. v. Widler et al
Plaintiff: ProEquities, Inc.
Defendant: Albany Widler, Aletha Widler, Rebecca Widler, Rachel Widler, Douglas L Widler and Douglas L. Widler
Case Number: 6:2019cv01125
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: J Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting as unopposed #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Douglas L. Widler's Motion for Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem, filed by Defendants Rebecca Widler and Rachel Widler. Defendants Rebecca Widler and Rachel Widler are granted an extension of time until July 29, 2019 to file their response(s) to #20 MOTION for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/3/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
July 3, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #20 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem by Defendants Rachel Widler, Rebecca Widler (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Boehm, Joshua)
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem by Defendant Douglas L. Widler (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Rosson, Shane)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Douglas L. Widler.(Rosson, Shane)
June 20, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Albany Widler.(Widler, Albany)
June 20, 2019 Filing 17 Re. E. Widler's ANSWER to Complaint -in-Interpleader by Rebecca Widler.(Boehm, Joshua)
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 Ra. J. Widler's ANSWER to Complaint -in-Interpleader by Rachel Widler.(Boehm, Joshua)
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 6/21/2019 for Defendant Albany Widler to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/06/2019. (jk)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Defendant Albany Widler is a registered pro se participant who will receive electronic notification, and who has been issued ECF privileges for electronic filing in this case. (gw)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 6/20/2019 for Defendants Rebecca Widler, Rachel Widler to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/05/2019. (jk)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Joshua J. Boehm on behalf of Rachel Widler, Rebecca Widler (Boehm, Joshua)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 6/21/2019 for Defendant Douglas L. Widler to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/03/2019. (jk)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Shane A. Rosson on behalf of Douglas L. Widler (Rosson, Shane)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Rachael K. Pirner on behalf of Douglas L. Widler (Pirner, Rachael)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by ProEquities, Inc. upon Douglas L. Widler served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019 (Wohlford, Will)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by ProEquities, Inc. upon Rachel Widler served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019 (Wohlford, Will)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by ProEquities, Inc. upon Rebecca Widler served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019 (Wohlford, Will)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by ProEquities, Inc. upon Albany Widler served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019 (Wohlford, Will)
May 14, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Albany Widler, Aletha Widler, Douglas L. Widler, Rachel Widler, Rebecca Widler (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff ProEquities, Inc. - trial to be held in Wichita. (Wohlford, Will)
May 13, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
May 13, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge J. Thomas Marten and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff ProEquities, Inc. (Wohlford, Will)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ProEquities, Inc. identifying The Dai-ichi Life Insurance Company, Limited as corporate parent . (Wohlford, Will)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4804009.), filed by ProEquities, Inc. (Wohlford, Will)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ProEquities, Inc. v. Widler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albany Widler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aletha Widler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Widler
Represented By: Joshua J. Boehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Widler
Represented By: Joshua J. Boehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas L Widler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas L. Widler
Represented By: Shane A. Rosson
Represented By: Rachael K. Pirner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ProEquities, Inc.
Represented By: Will B. Wohlford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?