Stutsman v. Kinder, et al.
Plaintiff: Linda Stutsman
Defendant: Patrick J kinder, Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company, Inc. and Patrick J. Kinder
Case Number: 6:2019cv01126
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION FOR CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT Against Defendant, Patrick J. Kinder by Linda Stutsman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Malone, Terry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Linda Stutsman re #7 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Deposit Funds of Fidelity & Guaranty Ins. Co. (Malone, Terry)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Linda Stutsman upon Patrick J. Kinder served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019 (Malone, Terry)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal-Reg. Agent by Linda Stutsman upon Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company, Inc. served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019 (Malone, Terry)
July 8, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #7 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Deposit Funds . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(bh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company, Inc. identifying FGL Holdings as corporate parent . (Stanfield, Jon)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss (Response deadline 7/24/2019), MOTION to Deposit Funds (Response deadline 7/17/2019) by Defendant Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company, Inc. (Stanfield, Jon) Modified on 7/8/2019 to remove referral information. (mam)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint/ #4 Second Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Patrick J. Kinder and COUNTERCLAIM against Linda Stutsman by Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company, Inc. (Stanfield, Jon)
June 4, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company, Inc., Patrick J. Kinder (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #4 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Linda Stutsman Amended Exhibit A in support of Amended Complaint. (Malone, Terry)
May 28, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Exhibit A re #4 is not redacted properly. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Linda Stutsman. (Malone, Terry) Modified on 5/28/2019 -- Exhibit A includes personal identifiers, document restricted. (mam)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Linda Stutsman.(Malone, Terry)
May 17, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Linda Stutsman. (Malone, Terry)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4809236.), filed by Linda Stutsman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Malone, Terry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stutsman v. Kinder, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Stutsman
Represented By: Terry J. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J kinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jon M. Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. Kinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?