Popp v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of

Plaintiff: Trasi Popp
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Case Number: 6:2019cv01129
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 6/3/2019 Summons served on Office of the Regional Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served Office of Regional Counsel 6/3/19)(Overton, Kathleen)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 6/7/2019 Summons served on United States Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit served Atty General 6/7/19)(Overton, Kathleen)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 6/3/2019 Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. Summons served on United States Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served US Atty 6/3/2019)(Overton, Kathleen)
May 31, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to Attorney for service). (jk)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Sam A. Crow for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Trasi Popp - trial to be held in Wichita. (Overton, Kathleen)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Trasi Popp. (Overton, Kathleen)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4812630.), filed by Trasi Dawn Popp.(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Popp v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trasi Popp
Represented By: Kathleen E. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?