Schroeder v. Nebraska Furniture Mart
Plaintiff: Joseph H. Schroeder, II
Defendant: Nebraska Furniture Mart
Case Number: 6:2019cv01131
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT. Plaintiff's claims are hereby DISMISSED as to Defendant. Signed by deputy clerk on 7/16/2019. Mailed to pro se party Joseph H. Schroeder, II at 300 S. Woodlawn #222 Derby, KS 67037 by regular mail. (mam)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER adopting #5 Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale's Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's claims are hereby DISMISSED as to Defendant as recommended in the R&R. The clerk is directed to enter judgment of dismissal. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 7/16/2019. Mailed to pro se party Joseph H. Schroeder, II at 300 S. Woodlawn #222 Derby, KS 67037 by regular mail. (mam)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Joseph H. Schroeder, II, Notice Re Pro Se Mailing, #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, addressed to Joseph H. Schroeder, II. Not remailed. (sz)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN Mail received re #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Joseph H. Schroeder, II #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, addressed to Joseph H. Schroeder, II. Not remailed. (sz)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN Mail received re #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Joseph H. Schroeder, II, #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis addressed to Joseph H. Schroeder, II. Not remailed. (sz)
June 19, 2019 NOTICE re Pro Se Mailing: Document #4 / #5 mailed to Joseph H. Schroeder, II at 300 S Woodlawn Blvd Apt 222 Derby, KS 67037 on 6/19/2019 by regular and certified mail (certified tracking #7019 0700 0000 5927 2977). (mam)
May 23, 2019 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Joseph H. Schroeder, II mailed to plaintiff on 5/23/2019 by certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number 70190700000059272908. (aw)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Dismissal re #1 Complaint filed by Joseph H. Schroeder, II. This document also serves as the Order granting Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The document is included in the Court's docketing system twice for administrative/tracking purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/23/19. Mailed to pro se party Joseph H. Schroeder II by certified mail. (df)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This document also serves as the Report & Recommendation of Dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint to the District Court. The document is included twice in the Court's docketing system for administrative/tracking purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/23/19. Mailed to pro se party Joseph H. Schroeder II by certified mail. (df)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joseph H. Schroeder, II (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Financial Status). (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (jk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Joseph H. Schroeder, II. (jk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Joseph H. Schroeder, II. (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schroeder v. Nebraska Furniture Mart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Furniture Mart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph H. Schroeder, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?