Vance v. Vance et al
Plaintiff: Stephen M. Vance
Defendant: Teri V. Hubbeling, Broce Manufacturing Co., Inc., Waldon Equipment, LLC, Michael F. Hubbeling, Julie B. Vance, Alan B. Vance and Broce Manufacturing Co. Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01136
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Michael P. Whaley to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4866599.) by Plaintiff Stephen M. Vance (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Tretbar, William)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Broce Manufacturing Co. Inc.; Michael F. Hubbeling; Teri V. Hubbeling; Alan B. Vance ; and Julie B. Vance answers due 7/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/3/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (rel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendants Broce Manufacturing Co. Inc., Michael F. Hubbeling, Teri V. Hubbeling, Alan B. Vance, Julie B. Vance (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Rupe, Alan)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 7/24/2019 for Defendant Waldon Equipment, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/20/2019. (jk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Kuhlman on behalf of Waldon Equipment, LLC (Kuhlman, Jeffrey)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell L. Herren on behalf of Waldon Equipment, LLC (Herren, Mitchell)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 7/05/2019 for Defendants Michael F. Hubbeling, Teri V. Hubbeling, Broce Manufacturing Co. Inc., Alan B. Vance, Julie B. Vance to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/06/2019. (jk)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jay F. Fowler on behalf of Broce Manufacturing Co. Inc., Michael F. Hubbeling, Teri V. Hubbeling, Alan B. Vance, Julie B. Vance. (Fowler, Jay)
June 6, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Waldon Equipment, LLC (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
May 30, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Broce Manufacturing Co. Inc., Michael F. Hubbeling, Teri V. Hubbeling, Alan B. Vance, Julie B. Vance (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles E. Geister, III for Stephen M. Vance pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 5/24/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (rel)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Charles E. Geister, III to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4817339.) by Plaintiff Stephen M. Vance. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Tretbar, William)
May 23, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Stephen M. Vance. (Tretbar, William)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4814819.), filed by Stephen M. Vance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Tretbar, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vance v. Vance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teri V. Hubbeling
Represented By: Jay F. Fowler
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Represented By: Jeremy K. Schrag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broce Manufacturing Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waldon Equipment, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell L. Herren
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Hubbeling
Represented By: Jay F. Fowler
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Represented By: Jeremy K. Schrag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie B. Vance
Represented By: Jay F. Fowler
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Represented By: Jeremy K. Schrag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan B. Vance
Represented By: Jay F. Fowler
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Represented By: Jeremy K. Schrag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broce Manufacturing Co. Inc.
Represented By: Jay F. Fowler
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Represented By: Jeremy K. Schrag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen M. Vance
Represented By: William P. Tretbar
Represented By: Charles E. Geister, III
Represented By: Charles E. Millsap
Represented By: John R. Gerdes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?