KCI Auto Auction, Inc. vs. Anderson, et al.

Plaintiff: KCI Auto Auction, Inc.
Defendant: Tom Ephrem, Alonzo D. Anderson, Lucky 7 Discount Auto Sales, LLC, Barry Ristick, Lucky 7 Used Cars, LLC, J. J. Ephrem, David Ephrem, Jason Ephrem, Quality Used Cars, LLC, Danny Ephrem and Angelo Jefferson
Garnishee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01137
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale no longer assigned to case Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/29/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(aw)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 WRIT OF GENERAL EXECUTION issued as to Lucky 7 Discount Auto Sales, LLC. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 5/24/2019. (mam)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 WRIT OF GENERAL EXECUTION issued as to Lucky 7 Used Cars, LLC. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 5/24/2019. (mam)
May 23, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Miscellaneous Case 18-101 has been transferred to the civil docket; all future filings should be made in this civil case, 19-1137. (kao)
May 17, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff KCI Auto Auction, Inc. (Stewart, Shawn) Modified on 5/17/2019 to remove referral information. (mam)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Post-Judgment Requests for Production of Documents on Judgment Debtors Lucky 7 Used Cars, L.L.C. and Lucky 7 Discount Auto Sales LLC by KCI Auto Auction, Inc. (Stewart, Shawn)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Order of Garnishment (Doc. 5) to Judgment Debtors Lucky 7 Used Cars, L.L.C. and Lucky 7 Discount Auto Sales LLC by KCI Auto Auction, Inc. (Stewart, Shawn)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of Order of Garnishment (Doc. 5) filed by Plaintiff KCI Auto Auction, Inc. (Stewart, Shawn)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER OF GARNISHMENT TO WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Answer & Instructions to Garnishee)(sz)
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT by KCI Auto Auction, Inc. as to Lucky 7 Used Cars, L.L.C. and Lucky 7 Discount Auto Sales, LLC. Garnishee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order of Garnishment, #2 Exhibit Answer of Garnishee)(Stewart, Shawn)
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing of Registration of Foreign Judgment by KCI Auto Auction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Registration of Foreign Judgment)(Stewart, Shawn)
February 20, 2018 Filing 2 REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT received from Western District of Missouri Case No. 17-CV-6086-NKL, filed by KCI Auto Auction, Inc.(sz)
February 16, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sz)
February 16, 2018 Filing 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - Registration of Foreign Judgment filed by Shawn E. Stewart on behalf of KCI Auto Auction, Inc.. Filing fee $47, receipt number AKSDC-4408586., filed by on behalf of KCI Auto Auction, Inc..(Stewart, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KCI Auto Auction, Inc. vs. Anderson, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Ephrem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alonzo D. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky 7 Discount Auto Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Ristick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky 7 Used Cars, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. J. Ephrem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ephrem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Ephrem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Used Cars, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Ephrem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelo Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KCI Auto Auction, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn E. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?