Salyer v. Internal Revenue Service, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Randall G. Salyer
Defendant: United States of America and Internal Revenue Service, Commissioner of
Case Number: 6:2019cv01140
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: J Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Personal Service on 6/5/2019 Randall G. Salyer served on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. Summons served on United States Attorney. (Brown, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 6/7/2019 to IRS Commissioner Rettig (Brown, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 6/7/2019 Attorney General William Barr (Brown, Michael)
May 30, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Internal Revenue Service, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to Attorney for service). (jk)
May 24, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge J. Thomas Marten and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Randall G. Salyer - trial to be held in Wichita. (Brown, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Randall G. Salyer. (Brown, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4817721.), filed by Randall G. Salyer.(Brown, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salyer v. Internal Revenue Service, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall G. Salyer
Represented By: Michael E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?