Western Agricultural Insurance Company et al v. Deere & Company
Plaintiff: Farm Bureau Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Western Agricultural Insurance Company
Defendant: Deere & Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01143
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 8/13/2019 at 02:30 PM in Topeka Courtroom 470 (ADM) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 7/23/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 8/6/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 8/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 7/10/2019. (ht)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Deere & Company re: #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Daniel, Peter)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Farm Bureau Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Western Agricultural Insurance Company re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Powell, Marc)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Niels P. Murphy for Deere & Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/20/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lawton R. Graves for Deere & Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/20/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Niels Patrick Murphy to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4843547.) by Defendant Deere & Company. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Ricke, Andrew)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Lawton Randolph Graves to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4843535.) by Defendant Deere & Company. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Ricke, Andrew)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Defendant Deere & Company's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(4)(A), a party who has filed a motion under Rule 12 is automatically allowed up to 14 days after notice of the court's denial of the motion to file a responsive pleading. Therefore, no motion for extension of time to answer plaintiffs' complaint is required while defendant's motion to dismiss is pending. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/7/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ks)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Petition by Defendant Deere & Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Daniel, Peter)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Deere & Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Daniel, Peter)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of State Court Filings Upon the Clerk of the Court of Stevens County, Kansas by Deere & Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Ricke, Andrew)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE -- Defendant Deere & Company served on 5/6/2019 by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Stevens County, Kansas District Court on 5/23/2019.) (mam)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Stevens County, Kansas for the Twenty-Six Judicial District. (Ricke, Andrew)
May 31, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Deere & Company. (Ricke, Andrew)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Stevens County, Kansas for the Twenty-Six Judicial District, case number 2019-CV-000005 Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4822663.), filed by Deere & Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings)(Ricke, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Agricultural Insurance Company et al v. Deere & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Bureau Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Marc A. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Agricultural Insurance Company
Represented By: Marc A. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deere & Company
Represented By: Andrew Jason Ricke
Represented By: Lawton R. Graves
Represented By: Peter F. Daniel
Represented By: Niels P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?