T-Mobile Central LLC et al v. Wichita, City of et al
Plaintiff: T-Mobile Central LLC and APC Towers III, LLC
Defendant: Wichita, City of and Wichita City Council
Case Number: 6:2019cv01162
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION re #20 Answer to Complaint to Withdraw Jury Demand by APC Towers III, LLC, T-Mobile Central LLC. (Kaplan, Robert)
August 14, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL of City Council by APC Towers III, LLC, T-Mobile Central LLC. (Kaplan, Robert)
August 12, 2019 Filing 22 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Seth Aaron Lowry on behalf of Wichita City Council, Wichita, City of. (Lowry, Seth)
July 24, 2019 Filing 21 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Lauren E. Laushman on behalf of Wichita City Council, Wichita, City of. (Laushman, Lauren)
July 24, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wichita, City of.(Mock, Terelle)
July 24, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #18 Motoin to Dismiss Party Wichita City Council by Defendant Wichita City Council. (Mock, Terelle) Modified on 7/24/2019 to remove Wichita, City of as a filer. (mam)
July 24, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Party Wichita City Council by Defendant Wichita City Council. (Mock, Terelle) Modified on 7/24/2019 to remove Wichita, City of as a filer. (mam)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 09:00 AM by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749, ACCESS CODE 3977627) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 7/31/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 8/14/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 8/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 7/17/19. (ks)
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 7/25/2019 for Defendants Wichita City Council, Wichita, City of to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 7/11/2019. (jk)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of T. Scott Thompson for T-Mobile Central LLC and APC Towers III, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/26/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Courtney DeThomas for APC Towers III, LLC and T-Mobile Central LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/26/2019. (mam)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney T. Scott Thompson to appear pro hac vice by Plaintiffs APC Towers III, LLC, T-Mobile Central LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Kaplan, Robert)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Courtney DeThomas to appear pro hac vice by Plaintiffs APC Towers III, LLC, T-Mobile Central LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Kaplan, Robert)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. The motions for leave for Courtney DeThomas and T. Scott Thompson to appear pro hac vice (ECF No. #9 and #10 ) are not signed by the moving party. The court orders local counsel to file corrected motions with the clerk's office by July 3, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/26/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ks)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney T. Scott Thompson to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4848164.) by Plaintiffs APC Towers III, LLC, T-Mobile Central LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form Thompson Application)(Kaplan, Robert)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Courtney DeThomas to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4848126.) by Plaintiffs APC Towers III, LLC, T-Mobile Central LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form DeThomas Application)(Kaplan, Robert)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by T-Mobile Central LLC, APC Towers III, LLC upon Wichita City Council served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019 (Kaplan, Robert)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by T-Mobile Central LLC, APC Towers III, LLC upon Wichita, City of served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019 (Kaplan, Robert)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 (DISREGARD, see #7 for the corrected filing) -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Plaintiffs APC Towers III, LLC, T-Mobile Central LLC executed upon Jamie Buster on 6/20/19. (Kaplan, Robert) Modified on 6/25/2019. (mam)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 (DISREGARD, see #8 for the corrected filing) -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Plaintiffs APC Towers III, LLC, T-Mobile Central LLC executed upon Jamie Buster on 6/20/19. (Kaplan, Robert) Modified on 6/25/2019. (mam)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by T-Mobile Central LLC identifying T-Mobile USA, Inc. as corporate parent (Kaplan, Robert)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by APC Towers III, LLC (Kaplan, Robert)
June 17, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wichita City Council, Wichita, City of. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
June 17, 2019 FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $400, receipt number W4631018954. (mam)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiffs T-Mobile Central LLC, APC Towers III, LLC. (mam)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by T-Mobile Central LLC, APC Towers III, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E) (mam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T-Mobile Central LLC et al v. Wichita, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T-Mobile Central LLC
Represented By: Robert W. Kaplan
Represented By: T. Scott Thompson
Represented By: Courtney DeThomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APC Towers III, LLC
Represented By: Robert W. Kaplan
Represented By: T. Scott Thompson
Represented By: Courtney DeThomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wichita, City of
Represented By: Terelle A. Mock
Represented By: Lauren E. Laushman
Represented By: Seth Aaron Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wichita City Council
Represented By: Terelle A. Mock
Represented By: Lauren E. Laushman
Represented By: Seth Aaron Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?