Steven et al v. Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Harold D. Johnson and Michael E. Steven
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01179
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 10/3/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 10/3/2019. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. The order is amended to reflect the proper party name. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/5/19. (ss)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 10/3/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 10/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/3/19. (ss)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response re #5 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file and serve their response no later than 9/10/2019. Defendant shall file its reply no later than 10/1/2019. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 8/23/2019. (mam)
August 22, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(jc)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiffs Michael E. Steven, Harold D. Johnson. (Schoenhofer, Mark) Modified on 8/22/2019 to remove referral information. (sz) Modified on 8/23/2019 to add Michael E. Steven as a filer. (mam)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Roger H. Stetson for Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/6/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Caroline Hamilton Sear for Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/6/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Roger H. Stetson to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4883846.) by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Wead, Shannon)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Caroline Hamilton Sear to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4883836.) by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Wead, Shannon)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wead, Shannon)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. (Wead, Shannon)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Shannon D. Wead on behalf of Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc.. (Wead, Shannon)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Michael E. Steven, Harold D. Johnson upon Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019 (Ayesh, Mark)
July 11, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
July 11, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Harold D Johnson, Michael E Steven. (Ayesh, Mark)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4860097.), filed by Michael E Steven, Harold D Johnson.(Ayesh, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven et al v. Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon D. Wead
Represented By: Roger H. Stetson
Represented By: Caroline Hamilton Sear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold D. Johnson
Represented By: Mark T. Schoenhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Steven
Represented By: David Michael Hahn
Represented By: Mark G. Ayesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?