Poky Feeders, Inc. v. SMH Cattle Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Poky Feeders, Inc.
Defendant: SMH Cattle Company, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv01180
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 MINUTE ENTRY to Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference RESET for 9/26/2019 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703. Report of parties' planning meeting and initial disclosures should be provided no later than 9/20/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
August 23, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Set of Written Discovery by Poky Feeders, Inc.. (McAndrews, Patrick)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Counter Defendant Poky Feeders, Inc., Plaintiff Poky Feeders, Inc.. (McAndrews, Patrick)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 STATE COURT RECORDS by SMH Cattle Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certified Copy of Record)(Knobel, David) Modified on 7/30/2019 to change name of document (sz).
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2019 at 10:00 AM(CDT) by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 for the conference. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 9/16/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 9/16/2019. (NOTE: As indicated in the Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling, copies of the parties' initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) must be attached to the parties' completed Rule 26(f) planning report. These disclosures will be discussed with the magistrate judge during the upcoming scheduling conference in finalizing a discovery and case plan that achieves the objectives of Rule 1.) See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/24/19. (aw)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John O'Brien as counsel for Poky Feeders, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/23/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney John OBrien to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4869983.) by Plaintiff Poky Feeders, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (McAndrews, Patrick)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Scott C. Sandberg as counsel for Poky Feeders, Inc., pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/23/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Scott C. Sandberg to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4869886.) by Plaintiff Poky Feeders, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (McAndrews, Patrick)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Jerome McAndrews on behalf of Poky Feeders, Inc. (McAndrews, Patrick)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Poky Feeders, Inc. and JURY DEMAND by SMH Cattle Company, LLC. (Knobel, David) Modified on 7/19/2019 to show the counterclaim was filed by SMH Cattle Company, LLC against Poky Feeders, Inc. (mam)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Proof of Service by SMH Cattle Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Federal Court)(Knobel, David)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric R. Henkel for SMH Cattle Company, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/12/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
July 12, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Eric R. Henkel to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4861360.) by Defendant SMH Cattle Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Of Eric Henkel, #2 ECF Registration Form ECF Registration Form)(Knobel, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant SMH Cattle Company, LLC - trial to be held in Wichita. (Knobel, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant SMH Cattle Company, LLC. (Knobel, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court Scott County, case number 2019-CV-000012 Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4861313.), filed by SMH Cattle Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Knobel, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poky Feeders, Inc. v. SMH Cattle Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Poky Feeders, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Jerome McAndrews
Represented By: Scott C. Sandberg
Represented By: John O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMH Cattle Company, LLC
Represented By: David F. Knobel, I
Represented By: Eric R. Henkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?