Carroll v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tama L Carroll and Tama L. Carroll
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01184
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: J Thomas Marten
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company - trial to be held in Wichita. (West, Craig)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company . (West, Craig)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(West, Craig)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 8/26/2019 for Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 8/06/2019. (jk)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Craig W. West on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (West, Craig)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- U.S.P.S. Priority Tracking Mail by Tama L. Carroll upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019 (King, Timothy)
July 18, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
July 18, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge J. Thomas Marten and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Tama L Carroll. (King, Timothy)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4865737.), filed by Tama L Carroll. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Designation of Place of Trial)(King, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carroll v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Craig W. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tama L Carroll
Represented By: Timothy J. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tama L. Carroll
Represented By: Timothy J. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?