Northwest Centre, LLC v. National American University
Plaintiff: Northwest Centre, LLC
Defendant: National American University
Case Number: 6:2019cv01215
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 Plaintiff and Counterclaim-Defendant's ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Northwest Centre, LLC.(Martens, Nathaniel)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National American University identifying DLORAH, INC. as corporate parent . (Steed, David)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by National American University. (Steed, David)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Counter Claimant National American University, Defendant National American University - trial to be held in Wichita. (Steed, David)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Northwest Centre, LLC by National American University.(Steed, David)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/02/2019 for Defendant National American University to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 9/13/2019. (jk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by David W. Steed on behalf of National American University. (Steed, David)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Northwest Centre, LLC upon National American University served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019 (Millsap, Charles)
August 26, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to National American University (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Northwest Centre, LLC identifying (None) as corporate parent . (Martens, Nathaniel)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Northwest Centre, LLC - trial to be held in Wichita. (Millsap, Charles)
August 21, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
August 21, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Northwest Centre, LLC. (Millsap, Charles)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4896892.), filed by Northwest Centre, LLC.(Millsap, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Centre, LLC v. National American University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National American University
Represented By: David W. Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Centre, LLC
Represented By: Charles E. Millsap
Represented By: Nathaniel Martens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?