EPRO Services, Inc. v. Regenesis Bioremediation Products
Plaintiff: EPRO Services, Inc.
Defendant: Regenesis Bioremediation Products
Case Number: 6:2019cv01220
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #8 Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Further Proceedings pending arbitration. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 9/4/2019. (cm)
September 3, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE by Plaintiff EPRO Services, Inc. re #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Further Proceedings Pending Arbitration (Witte, Michelle)
August 30, 2019 Filing 25 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michelle Moe Witte on behalf of EPRO Services, Inc. (Witte, Michelle)
August 30, 2019 Filing 24 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff EPRO Services, Inc. - trial to be held in Wichita. (Smith, Stanford)
August 30, 2019 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EPRO Services, Inc. (Smith, Stanford)
August 30, 2019 Filing 22 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Stanford J. Smith, Jr on behalf of EPRO Services, Inc. (Smith, Stanford)
August 29, 2019 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held August 27, 2019, before Judge Eric F. Melgren, Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson, 316-315-4334, jo_wilkinson@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Jason Anderson. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2019. (jw)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #3 Motion to Dissolve TRO. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 8/28/2019. (cm)
August 27, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Eric F. Melgren: MOTION HEARING held on 8/27/2019 re #3 MOTION to Dissolve a Temporary Restraining Order (FRCP, Rule 65(b)(4)) filed by Regenesis Bioremediation Products. The Court will issue an order within the next few days. (Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
August 27, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Regenesis Bioremediation Products (Gilman, Stacey)
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant Regenesis Bioremediation Products . (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Verified Petition and Request for TRO, #3 Summons to Regenesis Bioremediation Products, #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Notice to Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Declaration of Stanford J. Smith, Jr.)(Gilman, Stacey)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER expediting the deadline for EPRO Services, Inc. to respond to Regenesis Bioremediation Products re MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Further Proceedings Pending Arbitration #8 ; and for Regenesis Bioremediation Products to file any reply. Response deadline is set at 9/3/2019. Reply deadline is set at 9/6/2019. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 8/27/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(cm)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jason H. Anderson for Regenesis Bioremediation Products pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/; granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew B. Mason for Regenesis Bioremediation Products pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/26/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Supporting Documents by Regenesis Bioremediation Products. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Notice to State Court), #2 Exhibit B (Notice to Plaintiff))(Gilman, Stacey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING #6 MOTION to Expedite Notice on Defendant's Motion to Dissolve a Temporary Restraining Order (FRCP, Rule 65(b)(4)) : (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2019 at 03:00 PM in Wichita Courtroom 408 (EFM) before District Judge Eric F. Melgren. (cm)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Andrew B. Mason to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4903360.) by Defendant Regenesis Bioremediation Products (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andrew B. Mason, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Gilman, Stacey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Jason H. Anderson to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4903352.) by Defendant Regenesis Bioremediation Products (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jason H. Anderson, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Gilman, Stacey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Regenesis Bioremediation Products to Plaintiff of Removal to Federal Court (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal)(Gilman, Stacey)
August 26, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3 MOTION to Dissolve a Temporary Restraining Order (FRCP, Rule 65(b)(4)) . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df)
August 26, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #5 MOTION for Order (Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant's Motions to (1) Expedite Notice on Defendant's Motion to Dissolve a Temporary Restraining Order (FRCP, Rule 65(b)(4)) and (2) Dissolve a Temporary Restraining Order)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Further Proceedings Pending Arbitration by Defendant Regenesis Bioremediation Products(Gilman, Stacey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Further Proceedings Pending Arbitration by Defendant Regenesis Bioremediation Products (Gilman, Stacey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #6 MOTION to Expedite Notice on Defendant's Motion to Dissolve a Temporary Restraining Order (FRCP, Rule 65(b)(4)) by Defendant Regenesis Bioremediation Products (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason H. Anderson, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration)(Gilman, Stacey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite Notice on Defendant's Motion to Dissolve a Temporary Restraining Order (FRCP, Rule 65(b)(4)) by Defendant Regenesis Bioremediation Products (Gilman, Stacey) Modified on 8/27/2019 to remove referral information (sz).
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Order (Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant's Motions to (1) Expedite Notice on Defendant's Motion to Dissolve a Temporary Restraining Order (FRCP, Rule 65(b)(4)) and (2) Dissolve a Temporary Restraining Order) by Defendant Regenesis Bioremediation Products (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gilman, Stacey) Modified on 8/27/2019 to remove referral information (sz).
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #3 MOTION to Dissolve a Temporary Restraining Order (FRCP, Rule 65(b)(4)) by Defendant Regenesis Bioremediation Products (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason H. Anderson, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration)(Gilman, Stacey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dissolve a Temporary Restraining Order (FRCP, Rule 65(b)(4)) by Defendant Regenesis Bioremediation Products (Gilman, Stacey) Modified on 8/27/2019 to remove referral information (sz).
August 26, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Regenesis Bioremediation Products. (Gilman, Stacey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Sedgwick County, case number 2019-cv-001742 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4902750.), filed by Regenesis Bioremediation Products. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason H. Anderson, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration)(Gilman, Stacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EPRO Services, Inc. v. Regenesis Bioremediation Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regenesis Bioremediation Products
Represented By: Andrew B. Mason
Represented By: Stacey R. Gilman
Represented By: Jason H. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EPRO Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Moe Witte
Represented By: Stanford J. Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?