United States of America v. $81,000.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $81,000.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 6:2019cv01221
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2019 at 03:00 PM via Telephone (ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 3977627) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 11/29/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 12/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 10/23/2019. (ht)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 CLAIM by Kewone Watson-Beasley. (Joseph, Christopher)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM AND ORDER FOR NOTICE. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 8/27/2019. (sz)
August 26, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff United States of America. (Wood, Colin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by United States of America.(Wood, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $81,000.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $81,000.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Colin D. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?