United States of America v. Herrada et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Tiffany Mari Herrada, Christopher Lee Herrada and Tiffany Denee Mari
Case Number: 6:2019cv01230
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: John W Broomes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED by United States of America as to Tiffany Mari Herrada. (Jacobs, Michelle)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED by United States of America as to Christopher Lee Herrada. (Jacobs, Michelle) Modified on 10/28/2019 to change name of defendant listed on summons(sz).
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Tiffany Mari Herrada waiver sent on 9/4/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Jacobs, Michelle)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Christopher Lee Herrada waiver sent on 9/4/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Jacobs, Michelle)
October 7, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christopher Lee Herrada, Tiffany Mari Herrada (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SERVICE by United States of America of Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, a Waiver of Service of Summons, and copies of the Amended Complaint, ECF Filing Notice, and this Amended Certificate of Mailing (Jacobs, Michelle)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Reamortization Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Subsidy Repayment Agreement)(Jacobs, Michelle)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SERVICE by United States of America of Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, a Waiver of Service of Summons, and copies of the Complaint, ECF Filing Notice, and this Certificate of Mailing (Jacobs, Michelle)
September 4, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff USA. (Jacobs, Michelle)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Reamortization Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Subsidy Repayment Agreement)(Jacobs, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Herrada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Mari Herrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Lee Herrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Denee Mari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michelle A. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?