Buckeye Polymers, Inc. et al v. Bunting Magnetics Co.
Plaintiff: BPI Recycling, LLC and Buckeye Polymers, Inc.
Defendant: Bunting Magnetics Co.
Interested Party: Varilease Finance, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01251
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bunting Magnetics Co., filed by Buckeye Polymers, Inc., BPI Recycling, LLC.(Cline, Amy)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint as a separate docket entry within two (2) business days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/8/2019. (bh)
November 8, 2019 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, by Plaintiffs BPI Recycling, LLC, Buckeye Polymers, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Cline, Amy)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2020 at 03:30 PM via Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 12/18/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 1/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/6/2019. (ht)
October 30, 2019 Filing 23 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey D. Leonard on behalf of BPI Recycling, LLC, Buckeye Polymers, Inc.. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2019 Filing 22 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Amy Fellows Cline on behalf of BPI Recycling, LLC, Buckeye Polymers, Inc.. (Cline, Amy)
September 18, 2019 Filing 21 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Nathaniel Martens on behalf of Bunting Magnetics Co.. (Martens, Nathaniel)
September 18, 2019 Filing 20 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Thomas J. Lasater on behalf of Bunting Magnetics Co.. (Lasater, Thomas)
September 17, 2019 Filing 19 Letter to counsel of record regarding pro hac vice requirements. (sz)
September 17, 2019 Filing 18 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-01256. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (sz)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order of Transfer This Court, having filed its Memorandum of Opinion and Order, hereby transfers the case to the United States District Court for the District of Kansas. The Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio shall send the entire record in this case to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Kansas. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 9/16/2019. (JLG) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/17/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum of Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth herein, the Court grants Defendant's Motion to Transfer. ECF No. #8 . This action is transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Kansas pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 9/16/2019. (JLG) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/17/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Settlement Demand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bartolotta, John) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/17/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bartolotta, John) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/17/2019.]
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures filed by Bunting Magnetics Co. (Friesen, Brendon) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/17/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to continue Case Management Conference filed by BPI Recycling, LLC, Buckeye Polymers, Inc. (Bartolotta, John) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/17/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 Reply in support of #8 Motion to dismissMotion to transfer venue filed by Bunting Magnetics Co.. (Friesen, Brendon) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/17/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with Case Management Conference to be held telephonically on 9/25/2019 at 11:30 a.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at 330-884-7435, with all participants on the line. The Court requires personal participation of parties at the Case Management Conference, even when the conference is telephonic. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment No. 1, #2 Attachment No. 2, #3 Attachment No. 3, #4 Attachment No. 4, #5 Attachment No. 5) (S,Ke) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/17/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer Venue filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #8 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - BHC Dev., L.C. v. Bally Gaming, Inc.) (Bartolotta, John) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/17/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion to transfer venue filed by Defendant Bunting Magnetics Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Pro Forma Invoice, #3 Exhibit Purchase Order, #4 Exhibit Terms and Conditions, #5 Exhibit Plain Talk Warranty, #6 Exhibit Declaration of William C. Wagner, #7 Exhibit Federal Case Load Statistics)(Friesen, Brendon). [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/17/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Bunting Magnetics Co.. (Friesen, Brendon) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/17/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting as requested Defendant Bunting Magnetics Co.'s #6 Motion for Extension of Time until 7/5/2019 to Plead. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 6/7/2019. (JLG) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/17/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for extension of time until July 5, 2019 to plead filed by Defendant Bunting Magnetics Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's Request for Extension of Time to Move or Plead Pursuant to Local Rule 6(B))(Friesen, Brendon) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/17/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Exhibit 3 - Defendant's Request for Extension of Time to Move or Plead Pursuant to Local Rule 6(B), filed by Bunting Magnetics Co.. Related document(s) #1 . (Friesen, Brendon) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/17/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,Ke) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/17/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Bunting Magnetics Co.. Related document(s) #1 . (Friesen, Brendon) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/17/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Bunting Magnetics Co.. (Friesen, Brendon) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/17/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Mahoning County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CV-00856 Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9339419.. Filed by Bunting Magnetics Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Docket) (Friesen, Brendon) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckeye Polymers, Inc. et al v. Bunting Magnetics Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BPI Recycling, LLC
Represented By: Amy Fellows Cline
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buckeye Polymers, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Fellows Cline
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bunting Magnetics Co.
Represented By: Thomas J. Lasater
Represented By: Nathaniel Martens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Varilease Finance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?