Heter v. Hutchinson, Kansas, City of et al
Plaintiff: Jon Heter
Defendant: Hutchinson, Kansas, City of and Josh Long
Case Number: 6:2019cv01258
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 12/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 11/4/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(alm)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Hutchinson, Kansas, City of, Josh Long.(Keeley, Edward)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 11/01/2019 for Defendant Josh Long to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/17/2019. (jk)
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/31/2019 for Defendant Hutchinson, Kansas, City of to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/14/2019. (jk)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Jon Heter upon Josh Long served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019 (Michel, Larry)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Jon Heter upon Hutchinson, Kansas, City of served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019 (Michel, Larry)
September 23, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hutchinson, Kansas, City of, Josh Long (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
September 23, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Jon Heter. (Michel, Larry)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4928115.), filed by Jon Heter.(Michel, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heter v. Hutchinson, Kansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Heter
Represented By: Larry G. Michel
Represented By: Laurel A Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hutchinson, Kansas, City of
Represented By: Edward L. Keeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Long
Represented By: Edward L. Keeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?