United States of America v. Gossman et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Anthony Adams, Kansas Department for Children and Families, Scott County, Kansas, Tyler J. Gossman, Anastacia Gossman, Amanda E. Sanborn and Kansas Department of Revenue
Case Number: 6:2019cv01302
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony Adams, Tyler J. Gossman, Amanda E. Sanborn (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
January 6, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Amended Complaint by United States of America re #16 Amended Complaint (Metzger, Emily)
January 6, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - C)(Metzger, Emily)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion of the United States of America for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff United States of America shall file the Second Amended Complaint attached to its motion (ECF No. 12-1) within seven (7) days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/3/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Kansas Department for Children and Families.(Unruh, Troy)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Kansas Department of Revenue.(Wharton, Randall)
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #8 Amended Complaint (Second) by Plaintiff United States of America (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Metzger, Emily)
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Scott County, Kansas.(Faurot, Rebecca)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Anastacia Gossman waiver sent on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Metzger, Emily) Modified on 12/11/2019 to correct the sent/answer dates. (mam)
December 11, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET TEXT MODIFICATION by Deputy Clerk re #10 : Anastacia Gossman waiver sent on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (mam)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, a Waiver of Service of Summons, and Amended Complaint by United States of America re #8 Amended Complaint (Metzger, Emily)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exh A - Promissory Note, #2 Exh B - Mortgage, #3 Exh C - Subsidy Repayment Agreement)(Metzger, Emily)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by United States of America upon Scott County, Kansas served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certifed Green Card Proof of Service)(Metzger, Emily)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by United States of America upon Kansas Department of Revenue served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certifed Green Card Proof of Service)(Metzger, Emily)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by United States of America upon Kansas Department for Children and Families served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certified Green Card Proof of Service)(Metzger, Emily)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Disclaimer of Interest) by Kansas Department of Revenue.(Wharton, Randall)
November 22, 2019 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kansas Department for Children and Families, Kansas Department of Revenue, Scott County, Kansas (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, a Waiver of Service of Summons and Complaint by United States of America re #1 Complaint (attorney) (Metzger, Emily)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff United States of America. (Metzger, Emily)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exh A - Promissory Note, #2 Exh B - Mortgage, #3 Exh C - Subsidy Repayment Agreement)(Metzger, Emily)
November 15, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kansas Department for Children and Families, Kansas Department of Revenue, Scott County, Kansas (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
November 15, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Gossman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas Department for Children and Families
Represented By: Troy A. Unruh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott County, Kansas
Represented By: Rebecca Jean Faurot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler J. Gossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anastacia Gossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda E. Sanborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas Department of Revenue
Represented By: Randall J. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Emily B. Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?