Wright v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Katherine D. Wright
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Case Number: 6:2019cv01303
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed -- Office of the Regional Counsel served by Certified Mail on 12/6/2019. Copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff Katherine D. Wright at 111 1/2 Elizabeth Street, Scott City, KS 67871. (jk)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed -- United States Attorney General served by Certified Mail on 12/10/2019. Copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff Katherine D. Wright at 111 1/2 Elizabeth Street, Scott City, KS 67871. (jk)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed -- United States Attorney served by Personal Service on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. Copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff Katherine D. Wright at 111 1/2 Elizabeth Street, Scott City, KS 67871. (jk)
November 27, 2019 (DUPLICATE ENTRY FILED IN ERROR) SUMMONS ISSUED (ctv) - Modified text on 11/27/2019 (kao).
November 27, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to US Marshal for service). Copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff Katherine D. Wright at 111 1/2 Elizabeth Street, Scott City, KS 67871. (jk)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER; Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees, #3 , is GRANTED. The Clerk shall prepare a summons under Fed. R. Civ.P. 4 on Plaintiff's behalf. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #4 , is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling after the Commissioner has answered and filed the administrative record. Plaintiff should continue seeking counsel in the interim. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 11/27/19. Mailed to pro se party Katherine D. Wright by regular mail. (ctv)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Katherine D. Wright. (jk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Katherine D. Wright. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Financial Status) NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (jk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Katherine D. Wright. (jk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Katherine D. Wright. (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine D. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?