Hinnergardt v. Hoover
Plaintiff: Lance Hinnergardt
Defendant: M.D. Herbert C Hoover and Herbert C. Hoover
Case Number: 6:2019cv01323
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Diane Marie Plantz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Plantz, Diane)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/5/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 as participants. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 2/27/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 2/27/2020. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/9/20. (aw)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Written Discovery Responses by Herbert C. Hoover. (Wright, Brian)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Herbert C. Hoover.(Wright, Brian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Lance Hinnergardt - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Morantz, David)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 12/17/2019 for Defendant Herbert C. Hoover to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/03/2019. (jk)
December 3, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Herbert C. Hoover. (Wright, Brian)
December 3, 2019 CIVIL FILING FEE PAID ONLINE BY CREDIT CARD: re: #1 Notice of Removal, (paid $400 fee; Credit Card Receipt Number AKSDC-4996760). (Wright, Brian)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Seward County, KS, case number 19-cv-000086 Trial location of Wichita, filed by Herbert C Hoover. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Wright, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinnergardt v. Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Hinnergardt
Represented By: David R. Morantz
Represented By: Diane Marie Plantz
Represented By: Lynn R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Herbert C Hoover
Represented By: Brian C. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert C. Hoover
Represented By: Brian C. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?