Law Company, Inc., The v. CRC Construction Consulting, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Law Company, Inc., The
Defendant: Granite Re, Inc. and CRC Construction Consulting, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv01349
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 3/10/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 3/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 1/24/20. (ala)
January 23, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #8 Counterclaim by Law Company, Inc., The.(Green, David)
January 17, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Law Company, Inc., The identifying None as corporate parent . (Hoch, Wyatt)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ENTERED: The Court finds that Defendants have satisfied their burden to show why this case should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See order for details. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 1/15/20. (msb)
January 9, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Granite Re, Inc. identifying Federated Mutual Insurance Company as corporate parent . (Smith, Carol)
January 9, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CRC Construction Consulting, LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (Smith, Carol)
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #6 Order to Show Cause, by Defendants Granite Re, Inc., CRC Construction Consulting, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Operating Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Third Amended Operating Agreement)(Smith, Carol)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CRC Construction Consulting, LLC, Granite Re, Inc.. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Smith, Carol) Modified on 1/10/2020 to change name of document (sz).
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by CRC Construction Consulting, LLC, Granite Re, Inc.. (Smith, Carol)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 COUNTERCLAIM against Law Company, Inc., The, filed by CRC Construction Consulting, LLC.(Smith, Carol)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by CRC Construction Consulting, LLC, Granite Re, Inc..(Smith, Carol)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Defendants to Show Cause in writing on or before 1/14/2020, why this case should not be remanded to the state court for further proceedings due to lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 12/31/19. (ctv)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Evan B. Gatewood for CRC Construction Consulting, LLC and Granite Re, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 12/27/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Evan B. Gatewood to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5014787.) by Defendants CRC Construction Consulting, LLC, Granite Re, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit with ECF filing form)(Smith, Carol)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Certificate of Filing of Notice of Removal with State Court by CRC Construction Consulting, LLC, Granite Re, Inc.. (Smith, Carol)
December 23, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants CRC Construction Consulting, LLC, Granite Re, Inc. - trial to be held in Wichita. (Smith, Carol)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Sedgwick County, Kansas, case number 2019-cv-002502-CO Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5014680.), filed by Granite Re, Inc., CRC Construction Consulting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition - state court, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Law Company, Inc., The v. CRC Construction Consulting, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Law Company, Inc., The
Represented By: David Robert Green
Represented By: Wyatt A. Hoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Re, Inc.
Represented By: Carol Z. Smith
Represented By: Evan B. Gatewood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRC Construction Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Carol Z. Smith
Represented By: Evan B. Gatewood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?