Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Khalife et al
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Mayssa Zayat Trust, Elie Khalife and Mayssa Zayat
Case Number: 6:2020cv01049
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 16 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Patrick B. Hughes on behalf of Mayssa Zayat Trust, Mayssa Zayat. (Hughes, Patrick)
April 10, 2020 Filing 15 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 4/24/2020 for Defendants Mayssa Zayat Trust, Mayssa Zayat to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/10/2020. (mam)
April 10, 2020 Filing 14 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 4/24/2020 for Defendant Elie Khalife to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/10/2020. (mam)
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Bradley A. Stout on behalf of Mayssa Zayat Trust, Mayssa Zayat (Stout, Bradley)
April 9, 2020 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by John E. Rapp on behalf of Elie Khalife. (Rapp, John)
April 9, 2020 Filing 11 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Matthew K. Holcomb on behalf of Elie Khalife. (Holcomb, Matthew)
March 27, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company upon Mayssa Zayat served on 3/20/2020, answer due 4/10/2020 Hampton, John (Hampton, John)
March 27, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company upon Mayssa Zayat Trust served on 3/20/2020, answer due 4/10/2020 Hampton, John (Hampton, John)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company upon Elie Khalife served on 3/21/2020, answer due 4/13/2020 Hampton, John (Hampton, John)
March 25, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of John L Hampton by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Hampton, John)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thaddeus S. Kirk and Jeffrey M. Zielinski for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/27/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smc)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Thaddeus S. Kirk & Jeffrey M. Zielinski to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $100, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5072417.) by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form, #3 Affidavit, #4 ECF Registration Form)(Hampton, John)
February 21, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Elie Khalife, Mayssa Zayat Trust, Mayssa Zayat (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company - trial to be held in Wichita. (Hampton, John)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Philadelphia Immunity Insurance Company identifying Tokio Marine Group as corporate parent . (Hampton, John)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Philadelphia Immunity Insurance Company. (Hampton, John)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5066779.), filed by Philadelphia Immunity Insurance Company.(Hampton, John)
February 20, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Khalife et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayssa Zayat Trust
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Represented By: Bradley A. Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elie Khalife
Represented By: Matthew K. Holcomb
Represented By: John E. Rapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayssa Zayat
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Represented By: Bradley A. Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: John L. Hampton
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Zielinski
Represented By: Thaddeus S. Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?