Lazzo v. Frontier Wealth Management, LLC
Plaintiff: Lazzo and Mark Lazzo
Defendant: Frontier Wealth Management, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv01075
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Shawn Sokolosky re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay or Otherwise Dismiss This Proceeding MOTION to Stay Case MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Frontier Wealth Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Perry, Braden)
May 12, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Frank Derby re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay or Otherwise Dismiss This Proceeding MOTION to Stay Case MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Frontier Wealth Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Perry, Braden)
May 12, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Frontier Wealth Management, LLC re: #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay or Otherwise Dismiss This Proceeding MOTION to Stay Case MOTION to Dismiss (Perry, Braden)
April 28, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Mark Lazzo re #11 Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay or Otherwise Dismiss This Proceeding. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Griffin, William)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sharron E. Ash for Frontier Wealth Management, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/14/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Frank E. Derby for Frontier Wealth Management, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/14/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
April 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay or Otherwise Dismiss This Proceeding by Defendant Frontier Wealth Management, LLC. (Perry, Braden) Added Motion to Stay Case and Motion to Dismiss on 4/14/2020. (mam)
April 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Sharron E. Ash to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5115899.) by Defendant Frontier Wealth Management, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form Electronic Filing Registration Form)(Perry, Braden)
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Frank E. Derby to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5115881.) by Defendant Frontier Wealth Management, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Perry, Braden)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Braden M. Perry on behalf of Frontier Wealth Management, LLC. (Perry, Braden)
March 24, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Frontier Wealth Management, LLC (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 plaintiff's motion for leave to file exhibits under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/23/20. (jc)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Pltf's Exhibits C, D, and E of His Complaint by Plaintiff Mark Lazzo (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E)(Griffin, William)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying, without prejudice, motion to withdraw or seal exhibits (ECF No. 4). The motion states in a conclusory manner that the exhibits to plaintiff's complaint "contain confidential information that should not be made public and that would be too onerous to redact." At this stage, plaintiff has not demonstrated good cause to withdraw or seal any of these exhibits and thereby override the public's right of access to judicial records. For guidance on this legal standard, the court directs plaintiff's attention to Allen v. Kline, No. 07-2037, 2007 WL 3396470 (D. Kan. Nov. 13, 2007). Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/18/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jc)
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Withdraw Exhibits A-E to Complaint by Plaintiff Mark Lazzo (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Griffin, William)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Mark Lazzo. (Griffin, William)
March 16, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Civil cover sheet is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
March 16, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Mark Lazzo - trial to be held in Wichita. (Griffin, William)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5091059.), filed by Mark Lazzo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Griffin, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lazzo v. Frontier Wealth Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Wealth Management, LLC
Represented By: Braden M. Perry
Represented By: Sharron E. Ash
Represented By: Frank E. Derby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Lazzo
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Represented By: Samantha M. H. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?