Lima Charlie Sierra, LLC v. Textron Aviation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lima Charlie Sierra, LLC
Defendant: Textron Aviation Inc. and Textron Aviation, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01089
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lima Charlie Sierra, LLC. Textron Aviation, Inc. waiver sent on 4/22/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Herbers, Paul) Modified on 4/23/2020 to include the dates the waiver was sent and answer due. (mam)
March 31, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Textron Aviation, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Lima Charlie Sierra, LLC - trial to be held in Wichita. (Herbers, Paul)
March 30, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
March 30, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Lima Charlie Sierra, LLC. (Herbers, Paul)
March 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5102424.), filed by Lima Charlie Sierra, LLC.(Herbers, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lima Charlie Sierra, LLC v. Textron Aviation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron Aviation Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron Aviation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lima Charlie Sierra, LLC
Represented By: Paul Vincent Herbers
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Vasseur-Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?