Johnson v. Fawl
Plaintiff: Lewis Johnson
Defendant: Harold Fawl
Case Number: 6:2020cv01098
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER CHANGING DATE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference is moved to 7/2/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. COUNSEL WHO WILL PARTICIPATE MUST DIAL 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference deadline 6/11/2020. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 6/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/4/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ts)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. COUNSEL WHO WILL PARTICIPATE MUST DIAL 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference deadline 6/10/2020. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 6/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/20/2020. (ts)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Harold Fawl - trial to be held in Wichita. (Netherton, Stephen)
May 20, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Harold Fawl.(Netherton, Stephen)
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Lewis Johnson of Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Mann, Scott)
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Lewis Johnson of Subpoena (Mann, Scott)
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 5/28/2020 for Defendant Harold Fawl to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/29/2020. (jk)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Stephen H. Netherton on behalf of Harold Fawl. (Netherton, Stephen)
April 28, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Personal on 4/27/2020 Harold Fawl served on 4/28/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Mann, Scott) Modified on 5/1/2020 to correct service date and to remove that summons was served on the USA (sz).
April 17, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Harold Fawl (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
April 10, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Lewis Johnson - trial to be held in Wichita. (Mann, Scott)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Lewis Johnson. (Mann, Scott)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5112831.), filed by Lewis Johnson. (Mann, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Fawl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Johnson
Represented By: Scott J. Mann
Represented By: Jesse D. Tanksley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Fawl
Represented By: Stephen H. Netherton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?