Hirsh v. AMCOL Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: James Adam Hirsh
Defendant: AMCOL Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01147
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Civil Case Terminated per #17 Order of Dismissal. (mam)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Defendant AMCOL Systems, Inc. has moved to dismiss the case (Doc. #14 ), but never has filed an answer or motion for summary judgment. Liberally construing plaintiff's "Journal Entry of Dismissal" as a "Notice of Dismissal" (Doc. #16 ), the court dismisses this case without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 7/16/2020. Mailed to pro se party James Adam Hirsh at 410 W 53rd St S Wichita, KS 67217 by regular mail. (mam)
July 6, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff James Adam Hirsh (Titled "Journal Entry of Dismissal") (sz)
July 2, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant AMCOL Systems, Inc.(Dickinson, Joshua)
July 2, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant AMCOL Systems, Inc. (Dickinson, Joshua)
June 19, 2020 Filing 13 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against AMCOL Systems, Inc., filed by James Adam Hirsh. (mam)
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AMCOL Systems, Inc., filed by James Adam Hirsh. (mam)
June 15, 2020 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document 11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, mailed to James Adam Hirsh, 410 W. 53rd St. So., Wichita, KS 67217 on 6/15/2020 by regular mail. (aw)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 "Application for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Reply." Plaintiff's filing is actually a request to amend the state court petition that has since been removed to federal court. Plaintiff's request to amend the pleading is granted. The Court directs the clerk to file the "Amended Petition," as attached to Plaintiff's motion, as his amended pleading in this case. Defendant's deadline to file its Answer will be calculated from the date on which the clerk files Plaintiff's amended pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/15/2020. Mailed to pro se party James Adam Hirsh by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to file an Amended Petition by Plaintiff James Adam Hirsh. (Titled "Application for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Reply Under Local Rule 6.1(b)".) (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Petition) (mam)
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- AMCOL Systems, Inc. served by certified mail on 5/12/2020. (Originally filed in the Sedgwick County District Court on 5/18/2020.) (mam)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORDS from Sedgwick County District Court. (Attachments: #1 State Court Records)(Dickinson, Joshua)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff James Adam Hirsh - trial to be held in Wichita. (mam)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kersten L. Holzhueter on behalf of AMCOL Systems, Inc.. (Holzhueter, Kersten)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant AMCOL Systems, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Notice to State Court)(Dickinson, Joshua)
June 8, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Mailed to pro se party James Adam Hirsh at 410 W 53rd St S. Wichita, KS 67217 by regular mail. (mam)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal, to Plaintiff by AMCOL Systems, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Dickinson, Joshua)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AMCOL Systems, Inc. identifying AMCOL Holdings, LLC as corporate parent. (Dickinson, Joshua)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant AMCOL Systems, Inc. (Dickinson, Joshua)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sedgwick County District Court, case number 20SC0184 Trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5161409.), filed by AMCOL Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - State Court Action)(Dickinson, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hirsh v. AMCOL Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Adam Hirsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCOL Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Kersten L. Holzhueter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?