Goodrick v. Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Clarinda Goodrick
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. and Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv01193
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (Mouber, Bryan)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC - trial to be held in Wichita. (Mouber, Bryan)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC.(Mouber, Bryan)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Clarinda Goodrick (Back, Daniel)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Clarinda Goodrick upon Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt Card)(Back, Daniel)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC, filed by Clarinda Goodrick.(Back, Daniel)
August 14, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Clarinda Goodrick upon Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc. served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt Card)(Back, Daniel)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Clarinda Goodrick upon Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt Card)(Back, Daniel)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Clarinda Goodrick upon Ethicon, Inc. served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt Card)(Back, Daniel)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Clarinda Goodrick upon Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt Card)(Back, Daniel)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Clarinda Goodrick - trial to be held in Wichita. (Back, Daniel)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Clarinda Goodrick. (Back, Daniel)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5195351.), filed by Clarinda Goodrick.(Back, Daniel)
July 13, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
July 13, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodrick v. Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC
Represented By: Bryan E. Mouber
Represented By: Haley Ann Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarinda Goodrick
Represented By: Blake A. Shuart
Represented By: Daniel K. Back
Represented By: Andrew W. Hutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?