Haremza v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ladena Haremza
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2020cv01218
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Ladena Haremza of Compliance (Rhodes, Arthur)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Discovery Requests to Plaintiff by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Weist, John)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Offer of Judgment by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Weist, John)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Weist, John)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Allstate Corporation as corporate parent . (Weist, John)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 9/29/2020. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 10/13/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 9/9/2020. (ht)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 9/18/2020 for Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 9/03/2020. (jk)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by John R. Weist on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Weist, John)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Ladena Haremza upon Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020 (Rhodes, Arthur)
August 11, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
August 11, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Ladena Haremza. (Rhodes, Arthur)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5224248.), filed by Ladena Haremza.(Rhodes, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haremza v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladena Haremza
Represented By: Arthur E. Rhodes
Represented By: Richard W. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: John R. Weist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?