High Plains Farm Credit, FLCA v. Bradshaw et al.
Plaintiff: High Plains Farm Credit, FLCA
Defendant: Lease Finance Partners, Inc., Bank of Hays, Rodney R. Bradshaw, Arzella K. Bradshaw, Farm Service Agency, Mahieu Elder Law P.A., State of Kansas Department of Revenue, J & L Brown Family, LLC, Dealers Leasing, Inc. and Hanston State Bank
Case Number: 6:2020cv01223
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service by High Plains Farm Credit, FLCA. (Ufford, Martin)
October 9, 2020 Filing 24 JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. See attached for details. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 10/9/2020. (smc)
October 5, 2020 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Default Judgment as to Rodney R. Bradshaw and to Enter Proposed Journal Entry of Judgment as to All Parties by Plaintiff High Plains Farm Credit, FLCA (Ufford, Martin)
September 28, 2020 Filing 22 CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Rodney R. Bradshaw. (sz)
September 21, 2020 Filing 21 APPLICATION FOR CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT by High Plains Farm Credit, FLCA. (Ufford, Martin)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 10/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 9/15/2020. (ala)
September 11, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Farm Service Agency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Sinclair, Luke)
September 2, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Arzella K. Bradshaw.(McElgunn, Christopher)
September 2, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint Disclaimer by State of Kansas Department of Revenue.(Wharton, Randall)
August 20, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Lease Finance Partners, Inc..(Balbierz, Justin)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Defendant Farm Service Agency's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court extends the time within which Farm Service Agency shall file an answer or other responsive pleading for an additional thirty (30) days or to September 24, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/19/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
August 18, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Petition by Mahieu Elder Law P.A. (Originally filed in the Hodgeman County District Court on 8/6/2020.) (mam)
August 18, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Returned Executed -- United States Attorney General (for the Farm Service Agency) served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Hodgeman County District Court on 8/4/2020. (mam)
August 18, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Rodney R. Bradshaw served by RSTD/first class mail. (Originally filed in the Hodgeman County District Court on 8/4/2020.) (mam)
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL as to J & L Brown Family, LLC. (Originally filed in the Hodgeman County District Court on 8/4/2020.) (mam)
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Petition by State of Kansas Department of Revenue. (Originally filed in the Hodgeman County District Court on 7/30/2020.) (mam)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed -- United States Attorney (for the Farm Service Agency) served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Hodgeman County District Court on 7/23/2020.) (mam)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Petition by Bank of Hays. (Originally filed in the Hodgeman County District Court on 7/20/2020.) (mam)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Hodgeman County, Kansas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sinclair, Luke)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Farm Service Agency (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Sinclair, Luke)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, Request for Place of Trial, Certificate of Proof of Filing Pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 81.1(c)(3) by Farm Service Agency. (Sinclair, Luke)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Proof of Filing Pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 81.1(c)(3) by Farm Service Agency (Sinclair, Luke)
August 18, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant United States of America - trial to be held in Topeka. (Sinclair, Luke)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant United States of America. (Sinclair, Luke)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Hodgeman County, Kansas, case number 2020-CV-000005 Trial location of Topeka, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sinclair, Luke)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: High Plains Farm Credit, FLCA v. Bradshaw et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lease Finance Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Thomas Balbierz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Hays
Represented By: Creath L. Pollak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney R. Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arzella K. Bradshaw
Represented By: Christopher A. McElgunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Service Agency
Represented By: Luke P. Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahieu Elder Law P.A.
Represented By: Michelle D. Mahieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Kansas Department of Revenue
Represented By: Randall J. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & L Brown Family, LLC
Represented By: Shannon Wead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dealers Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Thomas Balbierz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanston State Bank
Represented By: Creath L. Pollak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: High Plains Farm Credit, FLCA
Represented By: Martin R. Ufford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?