Hackett v. All Things BBQ, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: John Hackett
Defendant: All Things BBQ, Inc. and Donald E. Cary
Case Number: 6:2020cv01225
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749, enter ACCESS CODE 5407703. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 11/5/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 11/5/2020. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10/5/20. (aw)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by All Things BBQ, Inc., Donald E. Cary.(Rupe, Alan)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell J. Spencer on behalf of All Things BBQ, Inc. (Spencer, Mitchell)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Alan L. Rupe on behalf of All Things BBQ, Inc. (Rupe, Alan)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by John Hackett upon Donald E. Cary served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020 (Elliott, Nathan)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified mail by John Hackett upon All Things BBQ, Inc. served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020 (Elliott, Nathan)
September 9, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Things BBQ, Inc., Donald E. Cary (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
August 20, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff John Hackett. (Elliott, Nathan)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5233629.), filed by John Hackett.(Elliott, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hackett v. All Things BBQ, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hackett
Represented By: Nathan Elliott
Represented By: Sean M. McGivern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Things BBQ, Inc.
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Represented By: Mitchell J. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Cary
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Represented By: Mitchell J. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?