Cressler v. Kansasland Tire Co., Inc. of Hays, Kansas
Plaintiff: Ross Cressler
Defendant: Kansasland Tire Co., Inc. of Hays, Kansas
Case Number: 6:2020cv01230
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER CHANGING TIME OF 11/5/2020 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. On the Court's own motion, the telephone Scheduling Conference before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James will be held at the earlier time of 10:00 AM on 11/5/2020. The dial in and access numbers remain the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/28/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(byk)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2020 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participating counsel must dial CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference deadline 10/15/2020. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 10/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/24/2020. (byk)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jacob Lee Kurtz on behalf of Kansasland Tire Co., Inc. of Hays, Kansas (Kurtz, Jacob)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kansasland Tire Co., Inc. of Hays, Kansas identifying None as corporate parent . (Kurtz, Jacob)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Kansasland Tire Co., Inc. of Hays, Kansas.(Kurtz, Jacob)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified mail by Ross Cressler upon Kansasland Tire Co., Inc. of Hays, Kansas served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020 (Omlid, Christopher)
August 25, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kansasland Tire Co., Inc. of Hays, Kansas (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
August 25, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Ross Cressler. (Omlid, Christopher)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5238456.), filed by Ross Cressler.(Omlid, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cressler v. Kansasland Tire Co., Inc. of Hays, Kansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Cressler
Represented By: Christopher Jon Omlid
Represented By: Richard W. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansasland Tire Co., Inc. of Hays, Kansas
Represented By: Jacob Lee Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?