Alley v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Dominicka Alley and Dominicka M. Alley
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2020cv01260
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company identifying None as corporate parent . (Norton, Michael)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company.(Norton, Michael)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2021 at 09:00 AM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 12/15/2020. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 12/29/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 12/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/16/2020. (ht)
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 11/20/2020 for Defendant Shelter Mutual Insurance Company to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 11/05/2020. (jk)
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael J. Norton on behalf of Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Norton, Michael)
October 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Dominicka M. Alley upon Shelter Mutual Insurance Company served on 10/16/2020, answer due 11/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pistotnik, Bradley)
September 29, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shelter Mutual Insurance Company (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
September 29, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Sam A. Crow and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Dominicka Alley. (Pistotnik, Bradley)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5270986.), filed by Dominicka Alley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pistotnik, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alley v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael J. Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominicka Alley
Represented By: Bradley A. Pistotnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominicka M. Alley
Represented By: Bradley A. Pistotnik
Represented By: William L. Barr, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?