Smoothie King Franchises, Inc. v. Rock Island Venue, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Smoothie King Franchises, Inc.
Defendant: Hamendra Bhakta, Rock Island Venue, Inc., Neil Bhakta and Five II Smooth Corp.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01284
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 12/21/2020 at 01:30 PM in Wichita Courtroom 408 (EFM) before District Judge Eric F. Melgren. (cm)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Response deadline 12/14/2020. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 12/3/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
December 2, 2020 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response as to #20 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #21 Brief in Support of Motion by Defendants Hamendra Bhakta, Neil Bhakta, Five II Smooth Corp., Rock Island Venue, Inc. (Wood, Mitchell) Modified on 12/2/2020 to remove referral information. (mam)
December 2, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: Preliminary Injunction hearing scheduled for 12/3/2020 cancelled to be rescheduled at a later date if required. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
December 2, 2020 Filing 24 CONSENT PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 12/2/2020. (sz)
December 2, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time as to #20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #21 Affidavit in Support of Motion . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
November 30, 2020 Filing 23 PLAINTIFFS' WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST by Smoothie King Franchises, Inc. for Preliminary Injunction hearing. (Skolaut, Paul) Modified on 12/1/2020 to change title of document (sz).
November 20, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 12/3/2020 at 01:30 PM in Zoom before District Judge Eric F. Melgren. Zoom log-in has already been emailed to counsel.(cm)
November 18, 2020 Filing 21 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #20 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Smoothie King Franchises, Inc. (Skolaut, Paul) Modified on 11/19/2020 to re-title. (mam)
November 18, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Smoothie King Franchises, Inc. (Skolaut, Paul)
November 18, 2020 Filing 19 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hamendra Bhakta, Neil Bhakta, Five II Smooth Corp., Rock Island Venue, Inc., filed by Smoothie King Franchises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23)(Skolaut, Paul)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 unopposed motion for leave to file a second amended complaint. Plaintiff shall file the second amended complaint as a separate docket entry forthwith. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/18/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
November 18, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #14 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Smoothie King Franchises, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint)(Skolaut, Paul)
November 3, 2020 Filing 16 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell E. Wood on behalf of All Defendants (Wood, Mitchell)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Deborah S. Coldwell, Sally L. Dahlstrom for Smoothie King Franchises, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/29/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (heo)
October 29, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hamendra Bhakta, Neil Bhakta, Five II Smooth Corp., Rock Island Venue, Inc., filed by Smoothie King Franchises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(Skolaut, Paul)
October 28, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Deborah S. Coldwell and Sally L. D. Dahlstrom to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $100, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5303605.) by Plaintiff Smoothie King Franchises, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 ECF Regstr Form for DSC, #2 Affidavit for DSC, #3 ECF Regstr Form for SLD, #4 Affidavit for SLD)(Skolaut, Paul)
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Complaint by Smoothie King Franchises, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (Skolaut, Paul)
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 AO FORM 120: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Skolaut, Paul)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Smoothie King Franchises, Inc.. Rock Island Venue, Inc. waiver sent on 10/20/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Skolaut, Paul)
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Smoothie King Franchises, Inc.. Hamendra Bhakta waiver sent on 10/20/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Skolaut, Paul)
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Smoothie King Franchises, Inc.. Neil Bhakta waiver sent on 10/20/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Skolaut, Paul)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Smoothie King Franchises, Inc.. Five II Smooth Corp. waiver sent on 10/20/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Skolaut, Paul)
October 26, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Per JPO Chambers, due to a mailing error on our end of #6 Order on Motion to Seal Case, plaintiff may withdraw the complaint by October 29, 2020 and re-file an amended complaint if they so choose and the clerk will not unseal the complaint until October 30, 2020. (heo)
October 22, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Other: AO120 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Seal Case. Plaintiff may withdraw the complaint by October 23, 2020, if it so chooses, and may re-file an amended complaint that refers to but does not attach the exhibits it does not want filed publicly. The clerk of court is directed not to unseal the complaint until October 26, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/21/2020. (heo)
October 19, 2020 FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $400, receipt number W4631023392. (mam)
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Smoothie King Franchises, Inc. identifying Smoothie King Systems, Inc., SK USA Inc., Smoothie King Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent. (jk)
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal Case by Plaintiff Smoothie King Franchises, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (jk)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Smoothie King Franchises, Inc. - trial to be held in Wichita. (jk)
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Smoothie King Franchises, Inc. (jk)
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 (WITHDRAWN per #12 ) -- COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Smoothie King Franchises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27) (jk) Modified on 10/28/2020, see #12 . (mam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smoothie King Franchises, Inc. v. Rock Island Venue, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smoothie King Franchises, Inc.
Represented By: Sally L. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Deborah S. Coldwell
Represented By: Paul J. Skolaut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamendra Bhakta
Represented By: Mitchell E. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rock Island Venue, Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell E. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Bhakta
Represented By: Mitchell E. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five II Smooth Corp.
Represented By: Mitchell E. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?