Almena State Bank v. Schneider
Plaintiff: Almena State Bank
Defendant: Lloyd T. Schneider
Counter Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Almena State Bank and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 6:2020cv01306
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: J Thomas Marten
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1821
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the FDIC-Receiver's motion to stay proceedings pending exhaustion of statutorily-mandated administrative remedies (ECF No. 9) is GRANTED, such that proceedings are STAYED until administrative remedies have been fully exhausted, which would be at least until the earlier of (i) the date on which the FDIC-Receiver makes a determination on any claim filed by counter-claimant Schneider, or (ii) 180 days after counter-claimant Schneider submits his claims under the mandatory administrative claims process. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the above-styled case is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. When the administrative claims process has concluded, the parties shall file a joint status report within five days, after which the court will place the case back on its active docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/23/2020. (ca)
November 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Case by Counter Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Woner, Bruce)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2020 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 12/3/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 12/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/4/2020. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. (ss)
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Originally filed in the Norton County District Court on 11/2/2020.) (mam)
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Defendant's Counterclaim by Almena State Bank. (Originally filed in the Norton County District Court on 7/21/2020.) (mam)
November 4, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS against Almena State Bank by Lloyd T. Schneider. (Originally filed in the Norton County District Court on 6/30/2020.) (mam)
November 4, 2020 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Norton County, Kansas. (Woner, Bruce)
November 4, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge J. Thomas Marten and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Counter Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation - trial to be held in Wichita. (Woner, Bruce)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Counter Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Woner, Bruce)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Norton County District Court, case number 2019-CV-000019, trial location of Wichita, filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Woner, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almena State Bank v. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd T. Schneider
Represented By: J. Eric Weslander
Represented By: Wesley F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Almena State Bank
Represented By: Bruce J. Woner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Bruce J. Woner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Almena State Bank
Represented By: Andrew J. Walter
Represented By: Bruce J. Woner
Represented By: Patricia Ann Reeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?