Killick Aerospace Limited et al v. Learjet, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: KILLICK AEROSPACE LIMITED, KILLICK AEROSPACE LLC and Killick Aerospace, LLC
Defendant: Bombardier, Inc., LEARJET, INC. and Bombardier Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01308
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Court previously issued a Show Cause Order directing Plaintiffs to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Doc. 5. Plaintiffs now move for dismissal under Rule 41(a)(2), suggesting that, upon consideration, this Court lacks jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' motion is granted and this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 11/18/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ctv)
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Plaintiffs Killick Aerospace Limited, Killick Aerospace, LLC (McElgunn, Christopher)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: THE COURT ORDERS that Plaintiffs SHOW CAUSE in writing on or before November 19, 2020, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 11/19/2020. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 11/5/2020. (mls)
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 (DUPLICATE, Redacted Exhibit C attached to #1 ) -- EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1 Complaint by Plaintiffs Killick Aerospace Limited, Killick Aerospace, LLC. (McElgunn, Christopher) Modified on 11/5/2020. (jk)
November 5, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Killick Aerospace, LLC identifying Killick Aerospace Holding, Inc. as corporate parent. (McElgunn, Christopher) Modified on 11/5/2020 to correct the filer.
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Killick Aerospace Limited, Killick Aerospace, LLC. (McElgunn, Christopher)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5312387.), filed by Killick Aerospace, LLC, Killick Aerospace Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McElgunn, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2020: #4 Redacted Exhibit C) (jk). Modified on 11/5/2020 Exhibit C includes confidential information, a redacted version has been attached. (jk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2020: #5 Redacted Exhibit A, #6 Redacted Exhibit B) (mam) Modified on 11/12/2020, Exhibits A & B include confidential information, redacted versions are attached. (mam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Killick Aerospace Limited et al v. Learjet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KILLICK AEROSPACE LIMITED
Represented By: Christopher A. McElgunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KILLICK AEROSPACE LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. McElgunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Killick Aerospace, LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. McElgunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEARJET, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?