Blu Nightclub et al v. Minns et al
Plaintiff: Party Express, LLC, Wichita's Ballroom, Bradley J Steven, The Cowboy Inn, Dallas Broz, Steven Peters, Vorshay's Cocktail Lounge, Jeannie Ahrens, Alan Brinkman, Kyle Okumura, The Rusty Nail, Chaomin Hsu, Revolution Lounge, Club Indigo dba Industry Old Town, Art Agner, Kristi Ivy, Blu Nightclub, Augustino Brewing Co., Augustine Iacopelli, The Stop, Nick Stutter, A & J's Music Room Bar & Grill, Josiah McCoy, Darren Greiving, Club Indigo Old Town LLC doing business as Industry Old Town, Stop, The, Nick Sutter, Cowboy Inn, The, Rusty Nail, The and Bradley J. Steven
Defendant: Lacey Cruse, Adrienne Byrne, Pete Meitzer, David Dennis, Cindy Claycomb, Chris Labrum, Tom Stolz, Brandon Whipple, Scott Wadle, Brandon Johnson, Darrell Haynes, Mark Sroufe, Garold Minns, Becky Tuttle, Gordon Ramsey, Douglas J Williams, Michael O'Donnell, Jeff Easter, Chris W. Labrum, Garold Mims, Douglas J. Williams, John Doe 1-20, Cindy Clayson and Doe Entities 1-20
Case Number: 6:2020cv01340
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 2/23/2021 at 02:30 PM by telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 2/2/2021. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 2/16/2021. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 2/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 1/20/2021. (ctv)
January 7, 2021 Filing 30 ANSWER to #26 Amended Complaint,, by Garold Minns.(Tibbets, Gaye)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 defendant Garold Minns' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Verified Amended Complaint. Defendant Garold Minns must file his answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' Verified Amended Complaint on or before January 7, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/18/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ks)
December 17, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #26 Amended Complaint,, by Defendant Garold Minns (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Tibbets, Gaye)
December 11, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Dismissal of Parties Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), or, alternatively pursuant to the Amended Complaint filed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(A) by A & J's Music Room Bar & Grill, Art Agner, Jeannie Ahrens, Augustino Brewing Co., Blu Nightclub, Alan Brinkman, Dallas Broz, Club Indigo Old Town LLC, Cowboy Inn, The, Darren Greiving, Chaomin Hsu, Augustine Iacopelli, Kristi Ivy, Josiah McCoy, Kyle Okumura, Party Express, LLC, Steven Peters, Revolution Lounge, Rusty Nail, The, Bradley J. Steven, Stop, The, Nick Sutter, Vorshay's Cocktail Lounge, Wichita's Ballroom (Miller, David)
December 11, 2020 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Doe 1-20, Doe Entities 1-20, Garold Mims, filed by Revolution Lounge, Cowboy Inn, The, Rusty Nail, The, Darren Greiving, Blu Nightclub, Kristi Ivy, Alan Brinkman, Art Agner, Augustine Iacopelli, McCoy, Dallas Broz, Wichita's Ballroom, Kyle Okumura, Augustino Brewing Co., Sutter, Steven Peters, Club Indigo Old Town LLC, Party Express, LLC, Chaomin Hsu, Stop, The, Jeannie Ahrens, Bradley J. Steven, A & J's Music Room Bar & Grill, Vorshay's Cocktail Lounge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Emergency Order 12/8/20)(Miller, David) Modified on 12/11/2020 to remove Josiah McCoy and Nick Sutter as filers. These plaintiffs are no longer parties to this case per #26 . (mam).
December 4, 2020 Filing 25 RRETURN OF SERVICE served on 12/1/2020 as to Defendant Gordon Ramsey. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN SEDGWICK COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 12/2/2020) (sz)
December 4, 2020 Filing 24 RETURN OF SERVICE served on 12/1/2020 as to Defendant Brandon Whipple. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN SEDGWICK COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 12/2/2020) (sz)
December 4, 2020 Filing 23 RETURN OF SERVICE served on 12/2/2020 as to Defendant Mark Sroufe. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN SEDGWICK COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 12/2/2020) (sz)
December 4, 2020 Filing 22 RETURN OF SERVICE served on 12/1/2020 as to Defendant Tom Stolz. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN SEDGWICK COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 12/2/2020) (sz)
December 4, 2020 Filing 21 RETURN OF SERVICE served on 12/1/2020 as to Defendant Scott Wadle. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN SEDGWICK COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 12/2/2020) (sz)
December 4, 2020 Filing 20 RETURN OF SERVICE served on 12/2/2020 as to Defendant Garold Mims. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN SEDGWICK COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 12/2/2020) (sz)
December 4, 2020 Filing 19 RETURN OF SERVICE served on 12/2/2020 as to Defendant Pete Meitzer. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN SEDGWICK COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 12/2/2020) (sz)
December 4, 2020 Filing 18 RETURN OF SERVICE served on 12/1/2020 as to Defendant Chris W. Labrum. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN SEDGWICK COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 12/2/2020) (sz)
December 4, 2020 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE served on 12/1/2020 as to Defendant Darrell Haynes. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN SEDGWICK COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 12/2/2020) (sz)
December 4, 2020 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE served on 12/1/2020 as to Defendant Jeff Easter. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN SEDGWICK COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 12/2/2020) (sz)
December 4, 2020 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE served on 12/1/2020 as to Defendant Douglas J. Williams. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN SEDGWICK COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 12/2/2020) (sz)
December 4, 2020 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE served on 12/1/2020 as to Defendant David Dennis. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN SEDGWICK COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 12/2/2020) (sz)
December 4, 2020 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE served on 12/1/2020 as to Defendant Lacey Cruse. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN SEDGWICK COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 12/2/2020) (sz)
December 4, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE served on 12/1/2020 as to Defendant Becky Tuttle. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN SEDGWICK COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 12/2/2020) (sz)
December 4, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE served on 12/1/2020 as to Defendant Cindy Clayson. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN SEDGWICK COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 12/2/2020) (sz)
December 4, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE served on 12/1/2020 as to Defendant Brandon Johnson. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN SEDGWICK COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 12/2/2020) (sz)
December 4, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE served on 12/1/2020 as to Defendant Adrienne Byrne. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN SEDGWICK COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 12/2/2020) (sz)
December 4, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
December 3, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Erik Houghton on behalf of Cindy Claycomb, Brandon Johnson, Gordon Ramsey, Becky Tuttle, Scott Wadle, Brandon Whipple (Houghton, Erik)
December 3, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Joint Notice of Removal and Joint Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal and exhibits by Adrienne Byrne, Cindy Claycomb, Lacey Cruse, David Dennis, Jeff Easter, Darrell Haynes, Brandon Johnson, Chris Labrum, Pete Meitzer, Garold Minns, Michael O'Donnell, Gordon Ramsey, Mark Sroufe, Tom Stolz, Becky Tuttle, Scott Wadle, Brandon Whipple, Douglas J Williams. (Tibbets, Gaye)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jon E. Newman on behalf of Adrienne Byrne, Lacey Cruse, David Dennis, Jeff Easter, Darrell Haynes, Chris Labrum, Pete Meitzer, Garold Minns, Michael O'Donnell, Mark Sroufe, Tom Stolz, Douglas J Williams. (Newman, Jon)
December 3, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Gaye B. Tibbets on behalf of Adrienne Byrne, Lacey Cruse, David Dennis, Jeff Easter, Darrell Haynes, Chris Labrum, Pete Meitzer, Garold Minns, Michael O'Donnell, Mark Sroufe, Tom Stolz, Douglas J Williams. (Tibbets, Gaye)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Adrienne Byrne, Cindy Claycomb, Lacey Cruse, David Dennis, Jeff Easter, Darrell Haynes, Brandon Johnson, Chris Labrum, Pete Meitzer, Garold Minns, Michael O'Donnell, Gordon Ramsey, Mark Sroufe, Tom Stolz, Becky Tuttle, Scott Wadle, Brandon Whipple, Douglas J Williams - trial to be held in Wichita. (Tibbets, Gaye)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORDS from Sedgwick County District Court. (Tibbets, Gaye)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Adrienne Byrne, Cindy Claycomb, Lacey Cruse, David Dennis, Jeff Easter, Darrell Haynes, Brandon Johnson, Chris Labrum, Pete Meitzer, Garold Minns, Michael O'Donnell, Gordon Ramsey, Mark Sroufe, Tom Stolz, Becky Tuttle, Scott Wadle, Brandon Whipple, Douglas J Williams. (Tibbets, Gaye)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sedgwick County District Court, case number 20-CV-001825 Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5340620.), filed by Michael O'Donnell, David Dennis, Brandon Johnson, Scott Wadle, Brandon Whipple, Becky Tuttle, Cindy Claycomb, Adrienne Byrne, Pete Meitzer, Garold Minns, Douglas J Williams, Gordon Ramsey, Darrell Haynes, Jeff Easter, Chris Labrum, Tom Stolz, Lacey Cruse, Mark Sroufe.(Tibbets, Gaye)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blu Nightclub et al v. Minns et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacey Cruse
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Represented By: Jon E. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrienne Byrne
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Represented By: Jon E. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Meitzer
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Represented By: Jon E. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Dennis
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Represented By: Jon E. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Claycomb
Represented By: Erik Houghton
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Labrum
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Represented By: Jon E. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Stolz
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Represented By: Jon E. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Whipple
Represented By: Erik Houghton
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Wadle
Represented By: Erik Houghton
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Johnson
Represented By: Erik Houghton
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Haynes
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Represented By: Jon E. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Sroufe
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Represented By: Jon E. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garold Minns
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Represented By: Jon E. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Tuttle
Represented By: Erik Houghton
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Ramsey
Represented By: Erik Houghton
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas J Williams
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Represented By: Jon E. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael O'Donnell
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Represented By: Jon E. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Easter
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Represented By: Jon E. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris W. Labrum
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Represented By: Jon E. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garold Mims
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Represented By: Jon E. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas J. Williams
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Represented By: Jon E. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Clayson
Represented By: Erik Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Party Express, LLC
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wichita's Ballroom
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley J Steven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cowboy Inn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Broz
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Peters
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vorshay's Cocktail Lounge
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannie Ahrens
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Brinkman
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Okumura
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Rusty Nail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaomin Hsu
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Revolution Lounge
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Club Indigo dba Industry Old Town
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Art Agner
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi Ivy
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blu Nightclub
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augustino Brewing Co.
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augustine Iacopelli
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Stop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Stutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A & J's Music Room Bar & Grill
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josiah McCoy
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Greiving
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Club Indigo Old Town LLC doing business as Industry Old Town
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stop, The
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Sutter
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cowboy Inn, The
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rusty Nail, The
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley J. Steven
Represented By: David Lawrence Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?