Hirsh v. Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.
Plaintiff: James Adam Hirsh
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01347
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
2 Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE by Defendant Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. re #18 Motion to Remand to State Court (Moss, Tyler)
February 9, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE by Defendant Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. re #16 Motion to Produce. (Moss, Tyler)
February 9, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE by Defendant Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. re #14 Motion to Remand, Motion for Directed Verdict. (Moss, Tyler)
February 9, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. re #13 Motion to Determine Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant Who Lacks Capacity to Pursue Litigation. (Moss, Tyler)
February 5, 2021 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #21 MOTION for Sanctions. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(adc)
February 5, 2021 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENT to #11 / #14 / #18 AND MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiff James Adam Hirsh. (Titled "Supporting Evidence for Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Request for Sanctions") (mam) Modified on 2/8/2021 to remove referral information. (mam)
February 5, 2021 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Produce. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(kf)
February 3, 2021 Filing 20 EXHIBIT A IN SUPPORT of #11 / #14 / #18 Motions to Remand to State Court and #15 Response to Motion by Plaintiff James Adam Hirsh. (mam)
February 1, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Rule 56 Summary Judgment AND MOTION to Produce by Plaintiff James Adam Hirsh. (Attachments: #1 Rule 56 Brief) (mam) Modified on 2/5/2021 to remove referral information. (mam)
January 28, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff James Adam Hirsh. (mam)
January 28, 2021 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT to #15 Response to Motion by Plaintiff James Adam Hirsh. (Titled "Plaintiffs Brief to Defendants Vexatious Litigant Lacking Capacity Allegation".) (mam)
January 27, 2021 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #16 MOTION to Produce. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(kf)
January 26, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Produce by Plaintiff James Adam Hirsh. (NOTE -- This is a duplicate of #15 ; titled "Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant's Allegations Part 2 and Motion to Produce".) (mam) Modified on 1/27/2021 to remove referral information. (mam)
January 26, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE by Plaintiff James Adam Hirsh re #13 Motion to Determine Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant Who Lacks the Mental Capacity to Pursue Litigation. (Titled "Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant's Allegations Part 2 and Motion to Produce"; filed twice to account for the response and motion.)(mam)
January 26, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand Under Rule 12(c) AND MOTION for Directed Verdict by Plaintiff James Adam Hirsh. (mam)
January 26, 2021 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #13 MOTION to Determine Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant Who Lacks the Mental Capacity to Pursue Litigation . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(kf)
January 25, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Determine Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant Who Lacks the Mental Capacity to Pursue Litigation by Defendant Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A to M in Support of Defendant's Motion to Determine Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant Who Lacks the Mental Capacity to Pursue Litigation)(Moss, Tyler) Modified on 1/26/2021 to remove referral information. (mam)
January 25, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE by Defendant Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. re #11 Motion to Remand to State Court, Motion for Hearing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A to M in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) (Moss, Tyler)
January 4, 2021 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Hearing. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(kf)
January 2, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court AND MOTION for Hearing by Plaintiff James Adam Hirsh. (Titled "Plaintiff's Answer and Motion for Hearing to Defendants Removal to Federal Court") (mam) Modified on 1/5/2021 to remove referral information. (mam)
December 28, 2020 NOTICE re Pro Se Mailing: Document #10 Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling mailed to James Adam Hirsh at 1903 E Lockwood St. Wichita, KS 67216 on 12/28/2020 by regular mail. (mam)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 3/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 12/23/2020. (ala)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren for all further proceedings. District Judge Holly L. Teeter no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 12/22/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(md)
December 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE: Case Number 6:20-cv-1135 by Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. (Moss, Tyler)
December 18, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.. (Moss, Tyler)
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORDS from Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Sedgwick County, State of Kansas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer to Complaint)(Moss, Tyler)
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lodgment of State Court Pleadings by Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer to Complaint)(Moss, Tyler)
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. identifying None as corporate parent . (Moss, Tyler)
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Moss, Tyler)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.. (Moss, Tyler)
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Sedgwick County, State of Kansas, case number 20-LM-13624 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5351266.), filed by Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Notice of Removal)(Moss, Tyler)
December 14, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff James Adam Hirsh at 1903 E. Lockwood, Wichita, KS 67216 by regular mail. (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hirsh v. Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Adam Hirsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.
Represented By: Tyler J. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?