Moral et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Carlos E. Moral and Julie K. Moral
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The and PHH Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 6:2021cv01070
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant JPMorgan Chase & Co.(Masoner, Michelle)
April 30, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant JPMorgan Chase & Co. (Masoner, Michelle)
April 29, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The.(Martin, Eric)
April 26, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Martin, Eric) Modified title on 4/29/2021 (ca).
April 26, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Martin, Eric) Modified title on 4/29/2021 (ca).
April 15, 2021 Filing 9 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 4/30/2021 for Defendant JPMorgan Chase & Co. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/15/2021. (jk)
April 12, 2021 Filing 8 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 4/28/2021 for Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/12/2021. (jk)
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 4/26/2021 for Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/12/2021. (jk)
April 6, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Carlos E. Moral, Julie K. Moral upon PHH Mortgage Corporation served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021 (Rathbun, Randall)
April 6, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Carlos E. Moral, Julie K. Moral upon Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021 (Rathbun, Randall)
April 6, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Carlos E. Moral, Julie K. Moral upon JPMorgan Chase & Co. served on 3/26/2021, answer due 4/16/2021 (Rathbun, Randall)
April 6, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Carlos E. Moral, Julie K. Moral upon Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021 (Rathbun, Randall)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Carlos E Moral, Julie K Moral. (Rathbun, Randall)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5439128.), filed by Carlos E Moral, Julie K Moral.(Rathbun, Randall)
March 17, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
March 17, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moral et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos E. Moral
Represented By: Dylan Patrick Wheeler
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie K. Moral
Represented By: Dylan Patrick Wheeler
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Eric David Martin
Represented By: William Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Michelle M. Masoner
Represented By: Robert J. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The
Represented By: Eric David Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Eric David Martin
Represented By: William Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?