Smith v. Amazon.com Services LLC
Plaintiff: Brian Smith and United Services Automobile Association
Defendant: Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com Services, Inc. and Dell Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv01074
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Toby Crouse
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #17 Letter regarding remand, addressed to Sedgwick County District Court. (mls)
May 7, 2021 Filing 17 Letter from USDC Kansas to Sedgwick County District Court regarding the remand of case number 2021-cv-000361-TO. Mailed via certified mail (certified tracking #7010 2780 0003 1928 1960). (mls)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 5/6/21. (ta) (mls).
May 5, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING and DEADLINES: The Scheduling Conference, and all associated deadlines, set for 5/12/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mitchell is cancelled. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
May 5, 2021 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC (Schrag, Jeremy)
April 29, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by Amazon.com Services LLC.(Schrag, Jeremy)
April 15, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amazon.com Services LLC, filed by Brian Smith.(Kennedy, Court)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David Hollye Fisk for Brian Smith pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 4/14/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
April 13, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed MOTION for attorney David H. Fisk to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5461415.) by Plaintiff Brian Smith (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice Registration Form, #2 Affidavit David H. Fisk)(Kennedy, Court)
April 12, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Amazon.com Services LLC.(Schrag, Jeremy)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 5/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 4/21/2021. Report of Parties Planning Meeting or Proposed Scheduled Order deadline 5/5/2021. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 5/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 4/1/2021. (ht)
March 26, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Requests to Defendant by Brian Smith. (Kennedy, Court)
March 26, 2021 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 4/12/2021 for Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 3/26/2021. (jk)
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Amazon.com Services LLC of Notice of Removal (Schrag, Jeremy)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC f/k/a Amazon.com Services, Inc. - trial to be held in Wichita. (Schrag, Jeremy)
March 22, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC f/k/a Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Schrag, Jeremy)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT RECORDS from Sedgwick County District Court. (Schrag, Jeremy)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sedgwick County District Court, case number 2021-CV-000361-TO Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5441934.), filed by Amazon.com Services LLC f/k/a Amazon.com Services, Inc..(Schrag, Jeremy)
March 22, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Amazon.com Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By: Jeremy K. Schrag
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy K. Schrag
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Smith
Represented By: Court T. Kennedy
Represented By: David Hollye Fisk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Services Automobile Association
Represented By: Court T. Kennedy
Represented By: David Hollye Fisk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?